Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2010-001312 Judge: Arbitration 01 | Astrowsky
File Date: 1/21/2010 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Discover Bank   Plaintiff    Valerie Dillard 
Sabin Burrell   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
5/28/2010  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  6/21/2010   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
4/28/2010  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  4/28/2010   
4/26/2010  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  5/4/2010   
2/12/2010  AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service  2/17/2010   
1/21/2010  COM - Complaint  1/25/2010   
1/21/2010  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  1/25/2010   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file