Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2009-092344 | Judge: | Driggs, Adam |
File Date: | 7/24/2009 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
S C F Arizona | Plaintiff | Scott Potter | |
Jostes Concrete Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cami L Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/7/2014 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 5/7/2014 | |
5/5/2014 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/12/2014 | |
4/28/2014 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/6/2014 | |
2/5/2014 | PSP - Petition for Supplemental Proceedings | 2/6/2014 | |
NOTE: Petition in Support of Supplemental Proceedings as to Defendants, Jostes Concrete, Inc. and Todd Jostes / E-FILE BILLING $27 | |||
1/8/2014 | NAR - Notice Of Appearance | 1/9/2014 | |
NOTE: Notice of Appearance | |||
11/29/2010 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 12/2/2010 | |
11/12/2010 | STJ - Stipulated Judgment | 11/29/2010 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
11/9/2010 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 11/9/2010 | |
11/5/2010 | SFJ - Stipulation For Judgment | 11/5/2010 | |
NOTE: Stipulation for Entry of Judgment | |||
8/25/2010 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 8/27/2010 | |
8/20/2010 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 8/24/2010 | |
8/11/2010 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 8/11/2010 | |
8/10/2010 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/10/2010 | |
7/30/2010 | ORD - Order | 8/4/2010 | |
NOTE: SCHEDULING | |||
7/23/2010 | STA - Statement | 7/26/2010 | |
NOTE: JOINT RULE 16(B) PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
6/24/2010 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 6/24/2010 | |
6/22/2010 | MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness | 6/22/2010 | |
NOTE: Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness | |||
1/26/2010 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 1/28/2010 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
1/22/2010 | ANS - Answer | 1/25/2010 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: PAID | |||
1/19/2010 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 1/20/2010 | |
1/19/2010 | DCL - Declaration | 1/20/2010 | |
NOTE: SUM CERTAIN | |||
1/19/2010 | MOT - Motion | 1/20/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |||
12/30/2009 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 12/30/2009 | |
11/19/2009 | ADE - Application For Default | 11/20/2009 | |
11/19/2009 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 11/20/2009 | |
11/19/2009 | ADE - Application For Default | 11/20/2009 | |
11/19/2009 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 11/20/2009 | |
11/19/2009 | ADE - Application For Default | 11/20/2009 | |
11/19/2009 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 11/20/2009 | |
10/26/2009 | ACS - Acceptance Of Service | 10/28/2009 | |
NOTE: CAMI L JOSTES SERVED 10/26/09 | |||
8/7/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/13/2009 | |
NOTE: TODD A JOSTES AND CAMI L JOSTES 08/05/2009 | |||
8/7/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/13/2009 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC 08/05/2009 | |||
8/7/2009 | SUM - Summons | 8/13/2009 | |
7/24/2009 | CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To | 7/27/2009 | |
7/24/2009 | COM - Complaint | 7/27/2009 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/30/2010 | 11:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
11/5/2010 | 9:30 | Status Conference |
5/5/2014 | 13:30 | Judgment Debtor Exam |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
11/12/2010 | F:S C F Arizona | $4,535.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Cami L Jostes | |||||
1/26/2010 | F:S C F Arizona | $455.80 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes | |||||
1/26/2010 | F:S C F Arizona | $45,342.88 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes |