Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2009-054787 Judge: Contes, Connie
File Date: 11/9/2009 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Joseph Neid   Plaintiff  Male  Pro Per 
Gail Reidy   Defendant  Female  Philip Nathanson 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/23/2019  DEW - Disposition Of Exhibit Worksheet  7/30/2019   
5/6/2019  LED - 2.8 (d) Letter  5/6/2019   
5/8/2012  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  5/10/2012   
4/23/2012  RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail  4/27/2012   
4/16/2012  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  4/16/2012   
4/12/2012  MEM - Memorandum  4/12/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S UNILATERAL PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM 
4/12/2012  MTD - Motion To Dismiss  4/13/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICE, AND TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS THE COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 
3/14/2012  ORD - Order  3/14/2012   
NOTE: *** DENIED *** ORDER SETTING A TELEPHONIC STATUS/ SHEDULING CONFERENCE 
2/21/2012  NOT - Notice  2/22/2012   
NOTE: NOTICE OF RETURNED MAIL 
2/16/2012  MOT - Motion  2/16/2012   
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO CONTINUE CASE DEADLINES OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
7/28/2011  OCW - Order for Withdrawal of Counsel  7/29/2011   
NOTE: ORDER TO WITHDRAW WITH CONSENT 
7/22/2011  MFW - Motion For Withdraw of counsel  7/25/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Withdraw with Consent 
7/21/2011  089 - ME: Trial Setting  7/21/2011   
7/19/2011  MEM - Memorandum  7/20/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Filing Unilateral Pretrail Memorandum 
5/18/2011  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  5/18/2011   
5/4/2011  ORD - Order  5/4/2011   
NOTE: Order Regarding Failure to Contact Judge Pro Tempore to Schedule Settlement Conference 
3/24/2011  070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set  3/24/2011   
3/4/2011  NOT - Notice  3/4/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Law Firm Name Change 
3/3/2011  083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont  3/3/2011   
3/2/2011  NOT - Notice  3/2/2011   
NOTE: Notice of Change of Address 
2/25/2011  066 - ME: Case Reassigned  2/25/2011   
2/10/2011  ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal  2/14/2011   
2/10/2011  CAO - Court Of Appeals Order  2/14/2011   
NOTE: DISMISSING APPEAL 
12/3/2010  084 - ME: Case Continued Inactive Calendar  12/3/2010   
11/24/2010  MEM - Memorandum  11/24/2010   
NOTE: Plaintiffs Unilateral Pretrial Memorandum 
10/11/2010  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  10/11/2010   
10/5/2010  MOT - Motion  10/6/2010   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO SET A RULE 16(b) COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TO CONTINUE CASE ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR 
7/26/2010  LET - Letter  7/26/2010   
7/26/2010  CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt  7/26/2010   
7/16/2010  LET - Letter  7/16/2010   
7/16/2010  AIX - Appeals Index  7/16/2010   
7/7/2010  339 - ME: 100 Day Notice  7/7/2010   
6/8/2010  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  6/24/2010   
NOTE: $500.00 FOR APPEAL BOND FOR GIAL REIDY 
6/6/2010  NAP - Notice Of Appeal  6/7/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT-COUNTER-PLAINTIFF’S NOTICE OF APPEAL / PAID $88.00 06/07/10 Receipt #20619702 
5/11/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  5/11/2010   
5/10/2010  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  5/10/2010   
5/7/2010  EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet  6/2/2010   
5/4/2010  022 - ME: Order Signed  5/4/2010   
5/4/2010  RES - Response  5/5/2010   
NOTE: Response to Counter-Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction 
4/30/2010  ORD - Order  5/13/2010   
NOTE: THAT PLAINTIFF JOE NEID HAS UNTIL MAY 4 2010 TO FILE THE RESPONSE TO THE AMENDED MOTION 
4/28/2010  STP - Stipulation  4/28/2010   
NOTE: Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Filing the Response to the Motion to Amend and Stipulation to Withdraw Answer Filed by Defendants Former Counsel 
4/23/2010  MOT - Motion  4/25/2010   
NOTE: COUNTER-PLAINTIFF’S AMENDED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 
4/23/2010  MTA - Motion To Amend  4/25/2010   
NOTE: COUNTER-PLAINTIFF’S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. 
4/21/2010  056 - ME: Hearing Set  4/21/2010   
4/16/2010  MOT - Motion  4/23/2010   
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND THEREAFTER PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 
4/16/2010  MEM - Memorandum  4/21/2010   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND THEREAFTER PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 
4/14/2010  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/14/2010   
3/19/2010  OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel  3/26/2010   
3/18/2010  STP - Stipulation  3/26/2010   
NOTE: FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT 
2/16/2010  ANS - Answer  2/24/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT GAIL REIDYS/ AND COUNTERCLAIM 
2/16/2010  NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel  2/24/2010   
NOTE: WITH CONSENT 
2/16/2010  ANS - Answer  2/25/2010   
NOTE: AND COUNTERCLAIM 
2/4/2010  AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default  2/4/2010   
NOTE: Application for Entry of Default of Gail Reidy and Affidavit on Default 
12/4/2009  NAR - Notice Of Appearance  12/9/2009   
12/4/2009  CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid  12/10/2009   
11/13/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/18/2009   
NOTE: SERVED GAIL REIDY 11/12/09 
11/13/2009  SUM - Summons  11/18/2009   
11/9/2009  COM - Complaint  11/17/2009   
11/9/2009  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/17/2009   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
5/6/2010  13:30  Emergency Hearing 
12/1/2010  9:45  Pre-Trial Conference 
7/20/2011  8:30  Status Conference 
4/13/2012  9:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file