Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2009-054723 | Judge: | Popham, Jr, Gary |
File Date: | 11/2/2009 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
G M A C Inc | Plaintiff | Bradley Thies | |
Todd Allen Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cami L Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Wells Fargo Bank N A | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/5/2017 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 6/8/2017 | Garnishee Defendant(4) |
2/3/2011 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated | 2/3/2011 | |
1/24/2011 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/2/2011 | |
12/1/2010 | 004 - ME: Hearing Continued | 12/1/2010 | |
11/22/2010 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 12/6/2010 | |
11/3/2010 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 11/8/2010 | |
NOTE: RE CIVIL CONTEMPT | |||
10/15/2010 | PTT - Petition | 10/20/2010 | |
NOTE: FORORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE CIVIL CONTEMPT | |||
8/25/2010 | RRM - Returned/ReMailed Mail | 8/27/2010 | |
8/4/2010 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 8/4/2010 | |
4/30/2010 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 5/21/2010 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
4/26/2010 | MOT - Motion | 5/4/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |||
4/26/2010 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 5/4/2010 | |
4/26/2010 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 5/4/2010 | |
4/26/2010 | AFF - Affidavit | 5/4/2010 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF SUM CERTAIN DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |||
4/26/2010 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 5/3/2010 | |
4/5/2010 | ADE - Application For Default | 4/15/2010 | |
NOTE: AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |||
4/5/2010 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 4/15/2010 | |
3/22/2010 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/24/2010 | |
NOTE: SERVED CAMI L JOSTES 03/04/10 | |||
3/22/2010 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 3/24/2010 | |
3/22/2010 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 3/24/2010 | |
NOTE: SERVED TODD ALLEN JOSTES 02/23/10 | |||
3/22/2010 | NOT - Notice | 3/26/2010 | |
NOTE: OF LAWSUIT | |||
3/22/2010 | NPF - Notice/Pending Forfeiture | 3/26/2010 | |
3/22/2010 | SUM - Summons | 3/26/2010 | |
3/19/2010 | ANS - Answer | 3/23/2010 | Defendant(3) |
NOTE: PAID | |||
2/10/2010 | 322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss | 2/10/2010 | |
11/30/2009 | BON - Bond | 12/8/2009 | |
NOTE: REPLEVIN/GMAC INC AS PRINCIPAL/MOTORS INSURANCE CORPORATION AS SURETY/$54,750.00 | |||
11/4/2009 | ORD - Order | 11/16/2009 | |
NOTE: FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE REPLEVIN | |||
11/2/2009 | COM - Complaint | 11/4/2009 | |
11/2/2009 | AFF - Affidavit | 11/4/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE REPLEVIN | |||
11/2/2009 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 11/4/2009 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
11/23/2010 | 13:30 | Order To Show Cause |
1/26/2011 | 13:30 | Order To Show Cause |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
4/30/2010 | F:G M A C Inc | $714.80 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Todd Allen Jostes | |||||
A: Cami L Jostes | |||||
4/30/2010 | F:G M A C Inc | $1,046.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
A: Todd Allen Jostes | |||||
A: Cami L Jostes | |||||
4/30/2010 | F:G M A C Inc | $50,706.51 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Todd Allen Jostes | |||||
A: Cami L Jostes |