« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2009-053305
Judge:
Civil Court Adm 01, Calendar
File Date:
6/30/2009
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Nationwide Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Edward Wallace
Party Name
Cummins Rocky Mountain L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Kathryn Leonard
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
A Inzina
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2010
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
6/9/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/2/2009
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/2/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/5/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/31/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/23/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/24/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
CUMMINS ROCKY MOUNTAIN LLC SERVED 7/8/09
Filing Date
7/8/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY SERVED 07/02/90
Filing Date
7/8/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/14/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/30/2009
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/6/2009
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.