Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2009-051870 | Judge: | Gordon, Michael |
File Date: | 4/9/2009 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
G M A C, L L C | Plaintiff | Lisa Bliss | |
Gulick Bros House Of Sound | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Todd Allen Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cami L Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Andrew Gulick | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Wells Fargo Bank | Garnishee Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/27/2017 | NOT - Notice | 6/28/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice to Discharge and Release Garnishee | |||
5/25/2017 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 5/30/2017 | |
5/25/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/31/2017 | |
5/5/2017 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 5/8/2017 | |
10/2/2014 | ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment | 10/3/2014 | |
NOTE: AFFIDAVIT OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT / EFILE BILLING $27 | |||
4/14/2014 | NOT - Notice | 4/14/2014 | |
NOTE: NOTICE TO DISCHARGE AND RELEASE GARNISHEE | |||
4/9/2014 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 4/14/2014 | |
4/9/2014 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/18/2014 | |
3/28/2014 | ANG - Answer Of Garnishee | 4/3/2014 | Garnishee Defendant(6) |
3/14/2014 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 3/20/2014 | |
12/14/2009 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 12/28/2009 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
12/3/2009 | MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear | 12/10/2009 | |
12/3/2009 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 12/10/2009 | |
12/3/2009 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 12/9/2009 | |
12/3/2009 | AAF - Application For Attorney Fees | 12/9/2009 | |
12/3/2009 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 12/9/2009 | |
8/28/2009 | AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 9/4/2009 | |
8/28/2009 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 9/4/2009 | |
7/10/2009 | RES - Response | 7/16/2009 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: TO SUMMONS | |||
7/9/2009 | NOT - Notice | 7/20/2009 | |
NOTE: OF LAWSUIT | |||
7/9/2009 | NPF - Notice/Pending Forfeiture | 7/20/2009 | |
7/9/2009 | SUM - Summons | 7/21/2009 | |
7/9/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/14/2009 | |
7/9/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2009 | |
NOTE: TODD ALLEN JOSTES SERVED 6-10-2009 | |||
7/9/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2009 | |
NOTE: CAMI L JOSTES SERVED 6-23-2009 | |||
7/9/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2009 | |
NOTE: ANDREW GULICK SERVED 5-13-2009 | |||
7/9/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/15/2009 | |
NOTE: GULICK BROS HOUSE OF SOUND SERVED 5-13-2009 | |||
5/1/2009 | BON - Bond | 5/7/2009 | Plaintiff(1) |
NOTE: $37,650.00/ GMAC LLC/ MOTORS INSURANCE CORPORATION | |||
4/15/2009 | ORD - Order | 4/21/2009 | |
NOTE: FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE REPLEVIN | |||
4/9/2009 | COM - Complaint | 4/16/2009 | |
4/9/2009 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 4/16/2009 | |
4/9/2009 | AFF - Affidavit | 4/16/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE REPLEVIN |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
10/2/2014 | F:G M A C, L L C | $18,635.96 | One Time | Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment | Modified |
A: Todd Allen Jostes | |||||
12/14/2009 | F:G M A C, L L C | $858.13 | One Time | Costs | Modified |
A: Gulick Bros House Of Sound | |||||
A: Todd Allen Jostes | |||||
12/14/2009 | F:G M A C, L L C | $1,356.50 | One Time | Attorney Fee | Modified |
A: Gulick Bros House Of Sound | |||||
A: Todd Allen Jostes | |||||
12/14/2009 | F:G M A C, L L C | $10,369.27 | One Time | Principal | Modified |
A: Gulick Bros House Of Sound | |||||
A: Todd Allen Jostes |