« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2009-034276 Judge: Brodman, Roger
File Date: 10/28/2009 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Ann M Malone   Plaintiff  Female  James Abdo 
Daniel Boyd   Plaintiff  Male  James Abdo 
William Buividas   Plaintiff  Male  James Abdo 
Brian A Miller   Plaintiff  Male  James Abdo 
Donna Rae Neill   Plaintiff  Female  James Abdo 
Phoenix Police Pension Board   Defendant    David Niederdeppe 
Ed Zuercher   Defendant  Male  David Niederdeppe 
Troy Hillman   Defendant  Male  David Niederdeppe 
Stan Hoover   Defendant  Male  David Niederdeppe 
Wendy Larsen   Defendant  Female  David Niederdeppe 
Gayle Starr   Defendant  Male  David Niederdeppe 
Jack F Harris   Defendant  Male  MICHAEL ANTHONY 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/28/2012  NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit  4/18/2012   
NOTE: $10,000 TO JUDICIAL WATCH INC 
3/27/2012  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  3/27/2012   
3/26/2012  ORE - Order To Release/Exonerate Bond  3/26/2012   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION FOR RELEASE OF $10,000 BOND 
3/5/2012  REL - Reply  3/5/2012   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendant Jack F. Harris' Response to Objection to Statement of Costs 
3/4/2012  ORD - Order  3/5/2012   
NOTE: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO REINSTATE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 
2/27/2012  RES - Response  2/28/2012   
NOTE: Defendant Harris' Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant Jack F. Harris' Statement of Costs 
2/21/2012  OBJ - Objection/Opposition.  2/22/2012   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO Defendant Jack F. Harris' Statement of Costs 
2/15/2012  SOC - Statement Of Costs  2/16/2012   
NOTE: STATEMENT OF COSTS 
2/15/2012  NOT - Notice  2/16/2012   
NOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO REINSTATE AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 
1/30/2012  MEB - Motion to Release/Exonerate Bond  1/30/2012   
NOTE: Plaintiffs' Motion for Release of $10,000 Bond 
12/5/2011  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  12/5/2011   
12/5/2011  019 - ME: Ruling  12/5/2011   
11/14/2011  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  11/14/2011   
11/3/2011  REL - Reply  11/3/2011   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ REPLY TO DEFENDANT JACK F. HARRIS’ OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS’ MOTION TO REINSTATE AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT ORAL ARGUMENT REQUESTED 
10/24/2011  RES - Response  10/25/2011   
NOTE: Defendant Jack Harris' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to reinstate and for Leave to File Amended Complaint 
10/4/2011  MOT - Motion  10/5/2011   
NOTE: Motion to Reinstate and Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 
9/7/2011  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  9/7/2011   
7/1/2011  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  7/1/2011   
3/29/2011  ORD - Order  3/29/2011   
NOTE: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
3/3/2011  UPI - Updated Information Address and/or Name  3/3/2011   
NOTE: Notice of New Address and Firm Name 
3/1/2011  NOT - Notice  3/1/2011   
NOTE: NOTICE OF LODGING FORM OF ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS’ MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
2/16/2011  019 - ME: Ruling  2/16/2011   
2/15/2011  020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement  2/15/2011   
1/21/2011  REL - Reply  1/24/2011   
NOTE: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT LIMITING SCOPE OF REVIEW AND DISCOVERY, DETERMINING APPLICABLE LAW, AND DISMISSING INDIVIDUAL BOARD MEMBERS 
1/21/2011  RES - Response  1/24/2011   
NOTE: PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD DEFENDANTS’ RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS’ STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL MATERIAL FACTS 
1/21/2011  REL - Reply  1/25/2011   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT HARRIS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
12/28/2010  RES - Response  12/28/2010   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT JACK F. HARRIS' STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL, MATERIAL FACTS 
12/28/2010  RES - Response  12/28/2010   
NOTE: in Opposition to Defendant Harris Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 
12/28/2010  RES - Response  12/28/2010   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
12/28/2010  RES - Response  12/29/2010   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS’ RESPONSE TO PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF ADDITIONAL, MATERIAL FACTS 
12/3/2010  094 - ME: Oral Argument Set  12/3/2010   
12/1/2010  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  12/1/2010   
11/24/2010  SOF - Statement Of Facts  12/1/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT HARRIS / IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
11/24/2010  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  11/24/2010   
NOTE: PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD DEFENDANTS’ MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT LIMITING SCOPE OF REVIEW AND DISCOVERY, DETERMINING APPLICABLE LAW, AND DISMISSING INDIVIDUAL BOARD MEMBERS 
11/24/2010  SOF - Statement Of Facts  11/24/2010   
NOTE: PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD DEFENDANTS’ STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 
11/24/2010  MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment  11/29/2010   
NOTE: DEFENDANT HARRIS / PARTIAL 
11/17/2010  027 - ME: Pretrial Conference  11/17/2010   
11/17/2010  CER - Certificate  11/18/2010   
NOTE: CERTIFICATION OF RECORD OF PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD 
11/1/2010  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  11/1/2010   
10/11/2010  003 - ME: Hearing Reset  10/11/2010   
9/30/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  9/30/2010   
9/16/2010  NOF - Notice Of Filing  9/27/2010   
NOTE: EXHIBIT 6 TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENANT JACK F HARRIS' MOTION IN LIMINE AND ERRATA SHEET 
9/14/2010  028 - ME: Status Conference Set  9/14/2010   
9/3/2010  MEM - Memorandum  9/8/2010   
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL AND PROPOSED ORDER 
9/2/2010  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  9/8/2010   
NOTE: $10000.00 FOR BOND FOR ANN M MALONE 
8/24/2010  MIL - Motion In Limine  8/25/2010   
NOTE: PARTIAL JOINDER IN DEFENDANT HARRISS MOTION IN LIMINE 
8/20/2010  RES - Response  8/26/2010   
NOTE: IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JACK F HARRIS' MOTION IN LIMINE 
8/19/2010  019 - ME: Ruling  8/19/2010   
8/5/2010  MIL - Motion In Limine  8/9/2010   
7/13/2010  041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set  7/13/2010   
7/8/2010  REQ - Request  7/12/2010   
NOTE: JOINDER IN DEFENDANT HARRIS'S/FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE 
6/24/2010  REQ - Request  6/29/2010   
NOTE: FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE 
6/14/2010  REL - Reply  6/17/2010   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANT PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO WAIVE OR SET BOND 
5/25/2010  RES - Response  5/28/2010   
NOTE: TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO WAIVE OR SET BOND 
5/12/2010  MOT - Motion  5/17/2010   
NOTE: TO WAIVE OR SET BOND 
3/26/2010  ORD - Order  4/7/2010   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE PAUL J ORFANEDES AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINITFFS 
3/10/2010  MOT - Motion  3/22/2010   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE PAUL J ORFAANEDES AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFFS 
3/10/2010  MOT - Motion  3/22/2010   
NOTE: TO ASSOCIATE JAMES F PETERSON AS CONSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFFS 
3/6/2010  ORD - Order  4/7/2010   
NOTE: GRANTING MOTION TO ASSOCIATE JAMES F PETERSON AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFFS 
1/6/2010  ANS - Answer  1/11/2010   
NOTE: PAID 
11/24/2009  ACS - Acceptance Of Service  12/2/2009   
NOTE: PHOENIX PENSION BOARD, ED ZUERCHER, TROY HILLMAN, STAN HOOVER, WENDY LARSEN AND GAYLE STARR SERVED 11/24/09 
11/18/2009  ANS - Answer  11/23/2009   
NOTE: PAID 
11/3/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/9/2009   
NOTE: WENDY LARSEN SERVED 10-29-2009 
11/3/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/9/2009   
NOTE: STAN HOOVER SERVED 10-29-2009 
11/3/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/9/2009   
NOTE: TROY HILLMAN SERVED 10-29-2009 
11/3/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/9/2009   
NOTE: PHOENIX POLICE PENSION BOARD;ED ZUERCHER SERVED 10-29-2009 
11/3/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/9/2009   
NOTE: JACK F HARRIS SERVED 10-29-2009 
11/3/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/9/2009   
NOTE: GAYLE STARR SERVED 10-29-2009 
11/3/2009  SUM - Summons  11/10/2009   
11/3/2009  SUM - Summons  11/10/2009   
11/3/2009  SUM - Summons  11/10/2009   
11/3/2009  SUM - Summons  11/10/2009   
11/3/2009  SUM - Summons  11/10/2009   
11/3/2009  SUM - Summons  11/10/2009   
11/3/2009  SUM - Summons  11/10/2009   
11/3/2009  SUM - Summons  11/10/2009   
10/28/2009  COM - Complaint  10/29/2009   
10/28/2009  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  10/29/2009   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
9/10/2010  14:00  Pre-Trial Conference 
10/13/2010  10:00  Status Conference 
11/10/2010  10:00  Status Conference 
2/11/2011  10:00  Oral Argument 
9/13/2011  9:00  Status Conference 
11/22/2011  10:00  Oral Argument 
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center