« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2009-027120
Judge:
Sinclair, Joan
File Date:
8/21/2009
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Charles Hoskins
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Kerry Martin
Party Name
Maricopa County Board Of Supervisors
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Fulton Brock
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Don Stapley
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Andrew Kunasek
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Max Wilson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Mary Rose Wilcox
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Maricopa County
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/31/2009
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
1/4/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Dismissal with prejudice
Filing Date
11/25/2009
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2009
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/24/2009
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.