« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2009-014434
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
5/5/2009
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Citibank South Datoka N A
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Joseph Whipple
Party Name
Leanne M Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
William Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Apollo Group Inc
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2009
Description
RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
10/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/15/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ENTRY OF AUTOMATIC STAY
Filing Date
9/1/2009
Description
OCL - Order Of Continuing Lien
Docket Date
9/15/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
ON NONEXEMPT EARNINGS
Filing Date
8/25/2009
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
8/28/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ORDER OF CONTINUING LIEN ON NONEXEMPT EARNINGS
Filing Date
8/11/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/19/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2009
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
8/17/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/11/2009
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
8/27/2009
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(4)
Filing Date
7/31/2009
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
8/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2009
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
7/29/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
6/25/2009
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
6/30/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2009
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
6/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
6/10/2009
Description
AAE - Application/Affidavit And Entry Of Default
Docket Date
6/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
5/15/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/15/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
LEANNE M HEMPHILL AND WILLIAM HEMPHILL SERVED 05/12/09
Filing Date
5/5/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2009
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
5/6/2009
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
7/14/2009
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Citibank South Datoka N A
A: Leanne M Hemphill
A: Leanne M Hemphill
Amount
$359.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
7/14/2009
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Citibank South Datoka N A
A: Leanne M Hemphill
A: Leanne M Hemphill
Amount
$15,897.43
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status