Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2009-011321 | Judge: | Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned |
File Date: | 4/8/2009 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Calportland Company | Plaintiff | James Reed | |
Jostes Concrete Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cami Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
T W Lewis Construction Inc | Defendant | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
12/9/2009 | LET - Letter | 12/15/2009 | |
12/1/2009 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 12/2/2009 | |
12/1/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/2/2009 | |
11/19/2009 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 11/25/2009 | |
8/17/2009 | OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds | 8/31/2009 | |
7/1/2009 | MOT - Motion | 7/10/2009 | |
NOTE: FOR RELEASE OF ATTACHED PROPERTY | |||
6/26/2009 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 7/7/2009 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
6/2/2009 | MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear | 6/4/2009 | |
6/2/2009 | AFF - Affidavit | 6/4/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS JOSTES CONCRETE INC TODD A JOSTES AND CAMI JOSTES | |||
5/20/2009 | AFF - Affidavit | 5/27/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS | |||
5/20/2009 | ADE - Application For Default | 5/27/2009 | |
NOTE: ENTRY OF/ AGAINST DEFENDANTS | |||
5/7/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/14/2009 | |
5/6/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/13/2009 | |
5/6/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/13/2009 | |
5/6/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/13/2009 | |
4/30/2009 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 4/30/2009 | |
4/29/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/5/2009 | |
4/29/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/5/2009 | |
4/29/2009 | ORD - Order | 5/8/2009 | |
NOTE: FINDINGS AND ORDER FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY AFTER NOTICE ATTACHMENT | |||
4/29/2009 | WRT - Writ | 5/7/2009 | |
NOTE: OF ATTACHMENT | |||
4/29/2009 | AFF - Affidavit | 5/7/2009 | |
NOTE: OF NINA SCOTT-FULKERSON IN SUPPORT OF APPLICAITON FOR ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE ATTACHMENT | |||
4/27/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/30/2009 | |
NOTE: T W LEWIS CONSTRUCTION INC SERVED 04/23/09 | |||
4/24/2009 | OSC - Order To Show Cause | 4/30/2009 | |
NOTE: GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ORDER / | |||
4/22/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/23/2009 | |
4/22/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/23/2009 | |
4/22/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/23/2009 | |
4/22/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/23/2009 | |
4/20/2009 | SUM - Summons | 4/23/2009 | |
4/20/2009 | SUM - Summons | 4/23/2009 | |
4/20/2009 | SUM - Summons | 4/23/2009 | |
4/20/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/28/2009 | |
NOTE: CAMI JOSTES SERVED 4/15/09 | |||
4/20/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/22/2009 | |
NOTE: TODD A JOSTES SERVED 04/15/09 | |||
4/20/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/22/2009 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC SERVED 04/15/09 | |||
4/17/2009 | MOT - Motion | 4/22/2009 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S FOR ORDER FOR DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTED PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED ON AN EXPEDITED BASIS | |||
4/17/2009 | APR - Application/Issuance/Provisional Remedies | 4/21/2009 | |
4/8/2009 | COM - Complaint | 4/9/2009 | |
4/8/2009 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 4/9/2009 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
4/29/2009 | 15:00 | Order To Show Cause |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
6/26/2009 | F:Calportland Company | $69,568.34 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes |