« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2009-007687
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Whitten
File Date:
3/6/2009
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Courtney Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Sabinus Megwa
Party Name
Kali Nicole Ezell
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Edwin Roberts
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/25/2009
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
12/7/2009
Filing Party
Defendant(2)
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
11/18/2009
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
11/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/28/2009
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
10/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2009
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
10/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of Settlement
Filing Date
10/5/2009
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
10/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITHIN SAME LAW FIRM
Filing Date
8/12/2009
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/12/2009
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
6/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
5/14/2009
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/14/2009
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
5/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
KALI NICHOLE EZELL SERVED 04/22/09
Filing Date
3/6/2009
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2009
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
3/9/2009
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.