« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2009-003470 Judge: Mroz, Rosa
File Date: 2/4/2009 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
John A Manzo   Plaintiff  Male  Jonathan O'Steen 
Nova M Radio Inc   Defendant    Pro Per 
Sheldon D Drobny   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Anita Drobny   Defendant  Female  Pro Per 
Sean Ryan   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
7/31/2009  042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full  7/31/2009   
7/21/2009  NDI - Notice Of Dismissal  7/31/2009   
NOTE: WITHOUT PREJUDICE 
7/8/2009  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  7/8/2009   
3/30/2009  ADE - Application For Default  4/1/2009   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS/ ENTRY OF / AGAINST DEFENDANT NOVA M RADIO INC 
2/25/2009  SUM - Summons  3/2/2009   
2/25/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/4/2009   
NOTE: NOVA M RADIO INC SERVED 2/20/09 
2/4/2009  COM - Complaint  2/6/2009   
2/4/2009  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  2/6/2009   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center