« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2008-092588
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
8/27/2008
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Steven Roddy
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Ezra Clark
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Sharon Moyer
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Sharon Moyer
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2010
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/24/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/29/2010
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
4/5/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2010
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
3/11/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/1/2010
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
2/3/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/18/2009
Description
314 - ME: Bankruptcy
Docket Date
8/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/13/2009
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
7/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/1/2008
Description
NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy
Docket Date
12/9/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2008
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
10/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2008
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
10/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
10/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
10/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV MESA INC SERVED 9/5/08
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY SERVED 9/5/08
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2008
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/27/2008
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/28/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.