« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2008-090958
Judge:
Driggs, Adam
File Date:
5/16/2008
Location:
Southeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Don M Parker
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
C Buck
Party Name
Annette R Parker
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
C Buck
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Richard Goldberg
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2008
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
11/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
10/27/2008
Description
STJ - Stipulated Judgment
Docket Date
10/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
10/22/2008
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
10/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ADDITIONAL ACCRUED INTEREST
Filing Date
10/1/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/1/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S TO STAY RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND STATEMENT OF COSTS PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT ONE PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1(E) ARIZ R CIV P
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
MFR - Motion For Reconsideration
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT ONE PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1(E) ARIZ R CIV P AND STAY RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST AND ACCRUED INTEREST
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING AMENDED PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNT TWO OF THE COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
9/3/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/3/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2008
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/5/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/4/2008
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
8/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S CONTORVERTING TO PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/4/2008
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
8/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S SEPARATE IN SUPPORT OF ITS RESPONSE OPPOSING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/27/2008
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
7/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
6/27/2008
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
7/1/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/16/2008
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
6/16/2008
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/17/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY SERVED 5/28/08
Filing Date
6/11/2008
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
6/13/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2008
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2008
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/20/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
11/3/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Don M Parker, Annette R Parker
A: Beaudry R V Company
Amount
$582,257.72
Frequency
One Time
Type
Total
Status
Date
10/27/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Don M Parker, Annette R Parker
A: Beaudry R V Company
Amount
$321.20
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
10/27/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Don M Parker, Annette R Parker
A: Beaudry R V Company
Amount
$3,455.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
10/27/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Don M Parker, Annette R Parker
A: Beaudry R V Company
Amount
$265,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
10/27/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Don M Parker, Annette R Parker
A: Beaudry R V Company
Amount
$21,981.52
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Date
10/27/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Don M Parker, Annette R Parker
A: Beaudry R V Company
Amount
$530,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status