Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2008-070636 | Judge: | Newcomb, Casey |
File Date: | 11/28/2008 | Location: | Northwest |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Thomas M West | Plaintiff | Male | Pro Per |
Jostes Concrete Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
3/5/2009 | 049 - ME: Judgment Signed | 3/5/2009 | |
2/20/2009 | DJU - Default Judgment | 2/24/2009 | Plaintiff(1) |
1/7/2009 | AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default | 1/8/2009 | Plaintiff(1) |
12/12/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2008 | |
NOTE: TODD JOSTES SERVED 12/09/08 | |||
12/12/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/16/2008 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC SERVED 12/09/08 | |||
11/28/2008 | COM - Complaint | 12/1/2008 | Plaintiff(1) |
11/28/2008 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 12/1/2008 | Plaintiff(1) |
11/28/2008 | SUM - Summons | 12/1/2008 | Plaintiff(1) |
11/28/2008 | ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees | 12/1/2008 | Plaintiff(1) |
11/28/2008 | ADW - Application Deferral/Waiver | 12/1/2008 | Plaintiff(1) |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
2/20/2009 | 11:15 | Default Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
2/20/2009 | F:Thomas M West | $356.00 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes | |||||
2/20/2009 | F:Thomas M West | $62,142.84 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes |