Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2008-052988 | Judge: | Civil Court Admin, Judge |
File Date: | 8/12/2008 | Location: | Northeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
G M A C, L L C | Plaintiff | Lisa Bliss | |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cami L Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
10/9/2008 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 10/20/2008 | |
NOTE: VOLUNTARY WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
10/9/2008 | NDI - Notice Of Dismissal | 10/22/2008 | |
NOTE: VOLUNTARY WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |||
10/1/2008 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 10/3/2008 | |
NOTE: UNSATISFIED | |||
9/16/2008 | BON - Bond | 9/23/2008 | |
NOTE: REPLEVIN $66,750.00 WITH GMAC LLC AS PRINCIPAL AND MOTORS INSURANCE CORPORATION AS SURETY | |||
8/13/2008 | ORD - Order | 8/15/2008 | |
NOTE: FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE REPLEVIN | |||
8/12/2008 | COM - Complaint | 8/13/2008 | |
8/12/2008 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 8/13/2008 | |
8/12/2008 | AFF - Affidavit | 8/13/2008 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITHOUT NOTICE REPLEVIN |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
There are no calendar events on file |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |