« Return to search results Civil Court Case Information - Case History
Case Information
Case Number: CV2008-032788 Judge: Abramson, Lindsay
File Date: 12/23/2008 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Redflex Traffic Systems Inc   Plaintiff    Scott Blaney 
Sandra Stevens   Plaintiff  Female  Scott Blaney 
John Doe   Defendant  Male  Pro Per 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/9/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  3/13/2009   
NOTE: GAIL JONES SERVED 3/4/09 
3/2/2009  IWH - Injunction Workplace Harassment  3/16/2009   
3/2/2009  MOT - Motion  3/19/2009   
NOTE: PLAINTIFFS / TO AMEND INJUCNTION TO REFLECT TRUE AND CORRECT NAME OF DEFENDANT 
2/27/2009  PTT - Petition  3/4/2009   
NOTE: AMENDED WORKPLACE INJUNCTION 
12/23/2008  PHW - Pet: Workplace Harassment  12/24/2008   
12/23/2008  IPH - Injunction Prohibit Harassment  1/5/2009   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file
click here for Law Library Resource Center