Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2008-032401 | Judge: | Z Unassigned, Z Unassigned |
File Date: | 12/19/2008 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Orco Construction Supply Inc | Plaintiff | John Parker | |
Jostes Concrete Inc | Defendant | Pro Per | |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
5/1/2009 | NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy | 5/6/2009 | |
NOTE: BY PLAINTIFF ORCO CONSTRUCTION SUPPLY COMPANY | |||
4/9/2009 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 4/13/2009 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
4/8/2009 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 4/10/2009 | |
NOTE: AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS | |||
4/8/2009 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 4/13/2009 | |
1/22/2009 | AED - Affidavit And Entry Of Default | 1/27/2009 | |
1/22/2009 | ADE - Application For Default | 1/27/2009 | |
12/26/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/31/2008 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC SERVED 12-22-08 | |||
12/26/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 12/31/2008 | |
NOTE: TODD JOSTES SERVED 12-22-08 | |||
12/26/2008 | SUM - Summons | 12/31/2008 | |
12/26/2008 | SUM - Summons | 12/31/2008 | |
12/19/2008 | COM - Complaint | 12/22/2008 | |
12/19/2008 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 12/22/2008 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
4/9/2009 | 13:30 | Default Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
4/9/2009 | F:Orco Construction Supply Inc | $484.60 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
4/9/2009 | F:Orco Construction Supply Inc | $801.00 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
4/9/2009 | F:Orco Construction Supply Inc | $52,281.04 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd Jostes |