« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2008-031340
Judge:
Fox, Dewain
File Date:
12/12/2008
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
James Vaughan
Party Name
Beaudry Motor Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
James Evans
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
James Evans
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/21/2010
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/6/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/10/2010
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
6/15/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/17/2010
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
5/17/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/11/2010
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/18/2010
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/20/2010
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
2/2/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGAINST THE GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/11/2010
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
1/12/2010
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Claims Against the Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Only
Filing Date
12/4/2009
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/21/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO JOINT PRE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
11/27/2009
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
12/3/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO JOINT PRE TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
11/27/2009
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/3/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRE TRIAL SCHEDULING
Filing Date
11/25/2009
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
11/25/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/24/2009
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
12/1/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DECLARING NO SETTLEMENT EXISTS BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS BEAUDRY
Filing Date
11/23/2009
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
12/1/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/16/2009
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
11/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/22/2009
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
11/5/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AS TO STEER SAFE INC ONLY
Filing Date
10/9/2009
Description
044 - ME: Case Reinstated
Docket Date
10/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/7/2009
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
10/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RULE 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
10/7/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF OPPOSITION TO BEAUDRYS MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
9/29/2009
Description
MCC - Mot/Cont On Inactive Calendar
Docket Date
10/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2009
Description
079 - ME: Case Dismissed - Partial
Docket Date
9/29/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/25/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/29/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND RULE 68 OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO BEAUDRY MOTOR COMPANY AND BEAUDRY RV COMPANY
Filing Date
9/25/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
9/18/2009
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/22/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN CONTROVENTION OF PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
9/18/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/23/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR THE COURT TO CONSIDER DEFENDANTS MEAUDRY'S PREVIOUSLY FILED MOTION TO SET ASIDE APPARENT SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
9/15/2009
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
9/15/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO ACCLERATE ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE APPARENT SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
9/9/2009
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
9/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/3/2009
Description
NOF - Notice Of Filing
Docket Date
9/9/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DECLARATION OF ANDREA PALMSTROM
Filing Date
8/31/2009
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
8/31/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2009
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
9/14/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/31/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/3/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO ACCELERATE ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SET ASIDE APPARENT SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
8/28/2009
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
9/2/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/3/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET ASIDE APPARAENT SETTLEMENT
Filing Date
8/21/2009
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
8/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/19/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/2/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 68 OFFER OF JUDGMENT TO BEAUDRY MOTOR COMPANY AND BEAUDRY RV COMPANE
Filing Date
7/22/2009
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
8/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DAVID MACIAS DBA BIG DAVES TOIWING & ROADSIDE SERVICE ONLY
Filing Date
7/20/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/31/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 68 OFFER OF JDUGMENT TO THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Filing Date
7/2/2009
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
7/9/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFEDNANT DAVID MACIAS DBA BIG DAVE'S TOWNING & ROADSIDE SERVICE ONLY
Filing Date
6/17/2009
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
6/25/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/20/2009
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
5/20/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2009
Description
NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/31/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
CHPATER 11 OF THE FEDERAL BANKRUPTCY CODE AND OF AUTOMATIC STAY
Filing Date
3/12/2009
Description
314 - ME: Bankruptcy
Docket Date
3/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2009
Description
CCA - Cert Compulsory Arbitration
Docket Date
3/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEER SAFE INC'S
Filing Date
3/10/2009
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
3/17/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEER SAFE INC'S
Filing Date
3/6/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFAUTOMATIC STAY RE MONACO COACH CORPORATION
Filing Date
3/6/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
3/13/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
MONACO COACH CORPORATION SERVED 2/4/09
Filing Date
3/4/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/6/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/4/2009
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DEFENDANTS DAVID MACIAS DBA BIG DAVE'S TOWING & ROADSIDE SERVICE TO PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-ARBITRABILITY
Filing Date
2/20/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
MICHAEL GOSE SERVED 02/11/09
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
3/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/19/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
2/12/2009
Description
314 - ME: Bankruptcy
Docket Date
2/12/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
2/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2009
Description
NOB - Notice Of Filing Bankruptcy
Docket Date
2/10/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/3/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY SERVED 1/30/09
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/9/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/10/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY'S
Filing Date
1/21/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED DAVID MACIAS ON 01/15/2009
Filing Date
1/15/2009
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/16/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY SERVED 1/9/09
Filing Date
1/15/2009
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/21/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2008
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/12/2008
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/15/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
11/23/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/23/2010
Time
9:00
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.