Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2008-026534 Judge: Astrowsky, Brad
File Date: 10/28/2008 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Kelly Cook   Plaintiff  Unknown  Kurt Hammond 
Sabin Burrell   Defendant  Unknown  Richard Neuheisel 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
3/12/2010  002 - ME: Hearing Vacated  3/12/2010   
3/10/2010  NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court  3/11/2010   
NOTE: $250.00 FOR CIVIL ARREST WARRANT BOND FOR SABIN LEE BURRELL 
3/5/2010  004 - ME: Hearing Continued  3/5/2010   
6/15/2009  097 - ME:CIVIL Arrest Warrant Issued  6/15/2009   
6/15/2009  023 - ME: Order Entered By Court  6/15/2009   
6/10/2009  NOT - Notice  6/16/2009   
NOTE: PLAINTIFF OF SUPPLYING IDENTIFIABLE INFORMATION ON SABIN BURRELL 
5/29/2009  RES - Response  6/3/2009   
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE 
5/27/2009  MCO - Motion To Continue  6/2/2009   
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS SET FOR JUNE 9 2009 AT 9:00 AM 
5/19/2009  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  5/28/2009   
5/4/2009  ORD - Order  5/8/2009   
NOTE: FOR APPEARANCE IN SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS 
4/21/2009  PTT - Petition  5/6/2009   
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT DEBTOR PROCEEDINGS 
4/1/2009  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/1/2009   
3/3/2009  JUD - Judgment  3/10/2009   
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties 
2/6/2009  324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator  2/6/2009   
12/24/2008  ANS - Answer  12/26/2008   
12/17/2008  ADE - Application For Default  12/18/2008   
11/19/2008  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/21/2008   
NOTE: SABIN BURRELL SERVED 11-13-08 
11/19/2008  SUM - Summons  11/21/2008   
10/28/2008  COM - Complaint  10/30/2008   
10/28/2008  CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To  10/30/2008   
Case Calendar
Date Time Event
6/9/2009  9:00  Judgment Debtor Exam 
3/3/2010  9:00  Judgment Debtor Exam 
3/10/2010  9:00  Judgment Debtor Exam 
Judgments
Date (F)or / (A)gainst Amount Frequency Type Status
3/3/2009  F:Kelly Cook  $21,703.40  One Time  Principal   
  A: Sabin Burrell