« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2008-021906
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
9/10/2008
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Sky Peak L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Roie Bar
Party Name
Suez 2816 Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Doris Dunatov
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
John Dunatov
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/21/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
10/30/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/28/2009
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
6/10/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
5/18/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/29/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED FOR DEFAULT JUDMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
4/17/2009
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
4/29/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2009
Description
NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
3/18/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2009
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
2/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
11/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/12/2008
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
11/14/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN DUANTOV SERVED 10-06-2008
Filing Date
10/16/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DORIS DUANTOV SERVED 10-06-2008
Filing Date
10/16/2008
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/16/2008
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2008
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/1/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/26/2008
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUEZ 2816 INC SERVED 9-17-2008
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/10/2008
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/11/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
5/28/2009
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Sky Peak L L C
A: Suez 2816 Inc
A: Suez 2816 Inc
Amount
$3,054.50
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
5/28/2009
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Sky Peak L L C
A: Suez 2816 Inc
A: Suez 2816 Inc
Amount
$39,175.73
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Date
5/28/2009
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Sky Peak L L C
A: Suez 2816 Inc
A: Suez 2816 Inc
Amount
$2,573.74
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
5/28/2009
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Sky Peak L L C
A: Suez 2816 Inc
A: Suez 2816 Inc
Amount
$2,573.74
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Date
5/28/2009
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Sky Peak L L C
A: Suez 2816 Inc
A: Suez 2816 Inc
Amount
$44,266.39
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status