Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2008-019129 | Judge: | Fox, Dewain |
File Date: | 8/11/2008 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Suncoast Post-Tension L P | Plaintiff | Joseph Glenn | |
Jostes Concrete Inc | Defendant | Edward Britt | |
Todd A Jostes | Defendant | Male | Edward Britt |
Richmond American Homes Of Arizona Inc | Defendant | ROBERT ROOS | |
Richmond American Homes Of Colorado | Defendant | Kirsten Copeland |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
2/24/2011 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 2/24/2011 | |
2/17/2011 | REL - Reply | 2/17/2011 | |
NOTE: Reply In Support of Rule 60(c) Motion to Reinstate | |||
2/11/2011 | RES - Response | 2/14/2011 | |
NOTE: Response to Rule 60(c) Motion to Reinstate | |||
2/8/2011 | ORD - Order | 2/10/2011 | |
NOTE: THAT DEFENDANTS RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF ARIZONA INC AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF COLORADO INC SHALL HAVE UPO TO AND INCLUDING FEBRUARY 11 2011 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S RULE 60(C) MOTION TO REINSTATE | |||
2/7/2011 | STP - Stipulation | 2/8/2011 | |
NOTE: Stipulation | |||
1/18/2011 | MOT - Motion | 1/21/2011 | |
NOTE: RULE 60(C)/TO REINSTATE | |||
12/20/2010 | 042 - ME: Case Dismissed - Full | 12/20/2010 | |
9/3/2010 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 9/3/2010 | |
10/13/2009 | NOT - Notice | 10/14/2009 | |
NOTE: Notice of Change in Counsel | |||
10/1/2009 | NRD - Notice Of Release Of Deposit | 10/5/2009 | |
NOTE: $87,894.21/ SUNCOST | |||
10/1/2009 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 10/5/2009 | |
NOTE: $87,894.21/ ESCROW MANAGEMENT ACCOUNT/ RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF ARIZONA | |||
9/22/2009 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/22/2009 | |
9/21/2009 | WRT - Writ | 9/28/2009 | |
NOTE: OF GARNISHMENT - ORDER TO RELEASE FUNDS | |||
9/11/2009 | ORD - Order | 9/15/2009 | |
NOTE: GRANTING JOSTES' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
9/9/2009 | REL - Reply | 9/14/2009 | |
NOTE: TO COUNTERCLAIM IN CV2008-018837 | |||
9/9/2009 | REL - Reply | 9/14/2009 | |
NOTE: TO COUNTERCLAIM IN CV2008-031828 | |||
9/3/2009 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 9/3/2009 | |
8/28/2009 | NOT - Notice | 9/2/2009 | |
NOTE: OF WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT AND NOTICE OF LODGING PROPOSED FORM OF ORDER | |||
8/25/2009 | REQ - Request | 8/28/2009 | |
NOTE: FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |||
8/24/2009 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 8/24/2009 | |
NOTE: Objection to Jostes Concretes Proposed Form of Judgment | |||
8/18/2009 | ANS - Answer | 8/18/2009 | |
NOTE: Richmond Americans Answer to Jostes Concretes Complaint Originally Filed in CV2008-018837 AND COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST JOSTES CONCRETE | |||
8/18/2009 | ANS - Answer | 8/18/2009 | |
NOTE: Richmond Americans Answer to Jostes Concretes Complaint Originally Filed in CV2008-031828 -and- Counterclaim against Jostes Complaint | |||
8/17/2009 | NOT - Notice | 8/18/2009 | |
NOTE: Notice of Non-Opposition | |||
8/12/2009 | MOT - Motion | 8/17/2009 | |
NOTE: TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING APPLICAITON FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND PROPOSED FORM OF JUDGMENT | |||
7/27/2009 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 7/27/2009 | |
7/22/2009 | 029 - ME: Status Conference | 7/22/2009 | |
7/21/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/31/2009 | |
7/21/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 7/31/2009 | |
7/20/2009 | JUD - Judgment | 8/3/2009 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
7/16/2009 | ORD - Order | 7/30/2009 | |
NOTE: SETTING HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY WITH NOTICE | |||
6/26/2009 | RQH - Request For Hearing | 7/14/2009 | |
NOTE: ON APPLICATION FOR PROVISIONAL REMEDY | |||
6/26/2009 | RQH - Request For Hearing | 6/26/2009 | |
NOTE: Request for Hearing on Application for Provisional Remedy (Writ of Garnishment) | |||
6/24/2009 | APR - Application/Issuance/Provisional Remedies | 6/30/2009 | |
NOTE: WITH NOTICE | |||
6/19/2009 | NOT - Notice | 6/25/2009 | |
NOTE: OF LODGING PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |||
6/19/2009 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 6/25/2009 | |
6/18/2009 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 6/18/2009 | |
6/12/2009 | RES - Response | 6/17/2009 | |
NOTE: TO SUNCOASTS REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND OR A RULING ON ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST JOSTES CONCRETE INC AND TODD A JOSTES | |||
6/4/2009 | REQ - Request | 6/11/2009 | |
NOTE: SUNCOAST'S FOR ORAL ARGUMENT AND/OR A RULING ON ITS SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST JOSTES CONCRETE INC AND TODD A JOSTES | |||
5/11/2009 | MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness | 5/14/2009 | |
5/6/2009 | 053 - ME: Case Consolidation | 5/6/2009 | |
3/18/2009 | REL - Reply | 3/24/2009 | |
NOTE: PLAINTIFF'S IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST JOSTES CONCRETE INC AND TODD A JOSTES | |||
3/3/2009 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 3/5/2009 | |
NOTE: CONTROVERTED IN SUPPORT OF JOSTES CONCRETE INC'S RESPONSE TO SUNCOAST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
3/3/2009 | AFF - Affidavit | 3/5/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF JOSTES CONCRETE INC'S RESPONSE TO SUNCOAST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
3/3/2009 | RES - Response | 3/5/2009 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC'S SUNCOAST'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |||
2/20/2009 | NOT - Notice | 3/2/2009 | |
NOTE: SUNCOAST'S AGREEMENT WITH RICHMOND AMERICAN'S REQUEST FOR DISCHARGE | |||
2/17/2009 | REL - Reply | 2/18/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |||
2/17/2009 | REL - Reply | 2/18/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF RENEWED MOTION FOR DISCHARGE | |||
2/13/2009 | REL - Reply | 2/18/2009 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC'S TO SUNCOAST POST-TENSION LP'S RESPONSE TO RICHARMOND AMERICAN'S MOTION FOR DISCHARGE | |||
2/10/2009 | RES - Response | 2/12/2009 | |
NOTE: TO RICHMOND AMERICANS REQUEST FOR DISCHARGE | |||
2/6/2009 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 2/10/2009 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE | |||
2/4/2009 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 2/6/2009 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC'S TO RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF ARIZONA INC'S RENEWED MOTION FOR DISCHARGE ORDER | |||
1/30/2009 | MOT - Motion | 2/5/2009 | |
NOTE: RENEWED FOR DISCHARGE | |||
1/22/2009 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 1/22/2009 | |
1/16/2009 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 1/23/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST JOSETES CONCRETE INC AND TODD A JOSTES | |||
1/15/2009 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 1/29/2009 | |
NOTE: AGAINST JOSTES CONCRETE INC AND TODD A JOSTES | |||
1/14/2009 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 1/14/2009 | |
12/18/2008 | REL - Reply | 12/23/2008 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC'S TO RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF ARIZONA NC'S RESPONSE TO MOTION TO VACATE DISCHARGE ORDER | |||
12/15/2008 | RES - Response | 12/18/2008 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION TO VACATE DISCHARGE ORDER | |||
12/2/2008 | MOT - Motion | 12/8/2008 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC'S TO VACATE DISCHARGE ORDER | |||
11/12/2008 | ANS - Answer | 11/14/2008 | |
11/6/2008 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 11/10/2008 | |
NOTE: REGARDING DEFNDANTS JOSTES CONCRETE INC AND TODD A JOSTES | |||
11/6/2008 | ADE - Application For Default | 11/10/2008 | |
NOTE: AMENDED/ AGAINST JOSTES CONCRETE INC AND TODD A JOSTES | |||
11/4/2008 | SUM - Summons | 11/6/2008 | |
11/4/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 11/6/2008 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC SERVED 10/28/08 | |||
10/21/2008 | NOT - Notice | 10/22/2008 | Defendant(4) |
NOTE: OF DEPOSIT | |||
10/21/2008 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 10/24/2008 | |
NOTE: $86502.81 FOR BOND BY FRANCES HAYNES | |||
10/15/2008 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 10/17/2008 | |
NOTE: RE DENFENDANTS JOSTES CONCRETE INC AND TODD A JOSRES | |||
10/15/2008 | ADE - Application For Default | 10/17/2008 | |
10/1/2008 | ORD - Order | 10/10/2008 | |
NOTE: PERMITTING DEPOSIT WITH CLERK OF THE COURT | |||
10/1/2008 | ORD - Order | 10/10/2008 | |
NOTE: DISCHARGE / | |||
9/8/2008 | SUM - Summons | 9/10/2008 | |
9/8/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 9/10/2008 | |
NOTE: RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF ARIZONA INC SERVED 8/25/08 | |||
9/5/2008 | MOT - Motion | 9/9/2008 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER PERMITTING DEPOSIT OF DISPUTED FUNDS WITH THE CLERK OF COURT | |||
9/3/2008 | MOT - Motion | 9/8/2008 | |
NOTE: OF DISCHARGE | |||
9/3/2008 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 9/8/2008 | |
9/3/2008 | ANS - Answer | 9/9/2008 | |
NOTE: TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM/CROSSCLAIM FOR INTERPLEADER | |||
8/22/2008 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 8/27/2008 | |
8/18/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/25/2008 | |
NOTE: TODD A JOSTES SERVED 8-13-2008 | |||
8/18/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 8/25/2008 | |
NOTE: JOSTES CONCRETE INC SERVED 8-13-2008 | |||
8/18/2008 | SUM - Summons | 8/26/2008 | |
8/11/2008 | COM - Complaint | 8/13/2008 | |
8/11/2008 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 8/13/2008 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/20/2009 | 10:45 | Status Conference |
7/21/2009 | 10:00 | Order To Show Cause |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
7/20/2009 | F:Suncoast Post-Tension L P | $4,390.50 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes | |||||
7/20/2009 | F:Suncoast Post-Tension L P | $405.61 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes | |||||
7/20/2009 | F:Suncoast Post-Tension L P | $155,552.08 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Jostes Concrete Inc | |||||
A: Todd A Jostes |