« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2008-012278
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
5/28/2008
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Ronald Calisher
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
THOMAS AXELSEN
Party Name
Gina Calisher
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
THOMAS AXELSEN
Party Name
John Dunatov
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Phoenix International Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2009
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
8/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/2/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/2/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2009
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Quash Civil Arrest Warrant Filed by John Dunatov
Filing Date
5/22/2009
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
5/26/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application to Withdraw as Counsel With Consent
Filing Date
3/20/2009
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/24/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/28/2009
Description
097 - ME:CIVIL Arrest Warrant Issued
Docket Date
1/28/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
12/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ISSUANCE OF CIVIL ARREST WARRANT
Filing Date
12/23/2008
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
12/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF JAMEY G ANDERSON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR CIVIL ARREST WARRANT
Filing Date
5/28/2008
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/28/2008
Description
PNM - Proof and/ or/ Notice of Mailing
Docket Date
5/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/28/2008
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
5/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF FILING FOREIGN JUDGMENT
Filing Date
5/28/2008
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
5/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
5/28/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Ronald Calisher, Gina Calisher
A: John Dunatov
A: John Dunatov
Amount
$4,636.76
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
5/28/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Ronald Calisher, Gina Calisher
A: John Dunatov
A: John Dunatov
Amount
$156.82
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
5/28/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Ronald Calisher, Gina Calisher
A: John Dunatov
A: John Dunatov
Amount
$172,684.77
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Date
5/28/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Ronald Calisher, Gina Calisher
A: John Dunatov
A: John Dunatov
Amount
$5,901,726.90
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status