Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2008-008609 | Judge: | Cronin, Mary |
File Date: | 4/16/2008 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Jeremy Garrett | Plaintiff | Male | Gary Wence |
Todd Jostes | Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Cami Jostes | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
4/21/2009 | RQW - Rel/Quash Writ Of Garnishment | 4/23/2009 | |
2/4/2009 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 2/12/2009 | |
2/4/2009 | WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons | 2/12/2009 | |
1/23/2009 | AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment | 1/28/2009 | |
1/5/2009 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/5/2009 | |
12/26/2008 | DFJ - Default Judgment | 1/8/2009 | |
NOTE: Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing | |||
12/24/2008 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 12/24/2008 | |
12/11/2008 | ASR - Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees | 12/15/2008 | |
11/21/2008 | MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear | 11/24/2008 | |
11/7/2008 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 11/12/2008 | |
NOTE: DEFAULT | |||
10/15/2008 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/15/2008 | |
10/7/2008 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 10/9/2008 | |
NOTE: AND MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE ON THE INACTIVE CALENDAR | |||
9/17/2008 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 9/17/2008 | |
9/3/2008 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 9/10/2008 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
8/14/2008 | NOT - Notice | 8/20/2008 | |
NOTE: WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |||
8/8/2008 | 324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator | 8/8/2008 | |
8/7/2008 | MOT - Motion | 8/14/2008 | |
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |||
8/7/2008 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 8/11/2008 | |
NOTE: DEFAULT | |||
6/13/2008 | AFD - Affidavit On Default | 6/18/2008 | |
6/13/2008 | ADE - Application For Default | 6/18/2008 | |
5/30/2008 | ODF - Order Deferring Court Fees | 6/5/2008 | |
5/30/2008 | ANS - Answer | 6/4/2008 | Defendant(2) |
NOTE: DEFERRED | |||
5/30/2008 | APD - Application For Deferral | 6/4/2008 | Defendant(3) |
5/14/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/23/2008 | |
NOTE: CAMI JOSTES SERVED 05/10/08 | |||
5/6/2008 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 5/8/2008 | |
NOTE: TODD JOSTES SERVED 4-30-2008 | |||
5/6/2008 | SUM - Summons | 5/13/2008 | |
4/16/2008 | COM - Complaint | 4/18/2008 | |
4/16/2008 | CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To | 4/18/2008 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
8/25/2008 | 9:00 | Default Hearing |
9/29/2008 | 9:00 | Default Hearing |
12/11/2008 | 13:30 | Default Hearing |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
12/26/2008 | F:Jeremy Garrett | $455.37 | One Time | Costs | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
12/26/2008 | F:Jeremy Garrett | $2,624.50 | One Time | Attorney Fee | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
12/26/2008 | F:Jeremy Garrett | $903.41 | One Time | Interest | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes | |||||
12/26/2008 | F:Jeremy Garrett | $24,500.00 | One Time | Principal | |
A: Todd Jostes | |||||
A: Cami Jostes |