Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2008-002416 Judge: Gates, Pamela
File Date: 1/31/2008 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Xcentric Ventures L L C   Plaintiff    Maria Speth 
Edward Magedson   Plaintiff  Male  Maria Speth 
Village Voice Media L L C   Defendant    Michael Meehan 
New Times Media L L C   Defendant    Michael Meehan 
Sarah Fenske   Defendant  Female  Michael Meehan 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
1/8/2009  ODI - Order Of Dismissal  1/22/2009   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
1/5/2009  SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal  1/7/2009   
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE 
11/5/2008  078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar  11/5/2008   
6/13/2008  ANS - Answer  6/17/2008   
NOTE: PAID 
6/12/2008  SUM - Summons  6/16/2008   
5/27/2008  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/2/2008   
NOTE: SERVED NEW TIMES MEDIA LLC ON 05/20/2008 
5/27/2008  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/2/2008   
NOTE: SERVED SARAH FENSKE & JOHN DOE ON 05/20/2008 
5/27/2008  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  6/2/2008   
NOTE: SERVED BILLAGE VOICE MEDIA LLC ON 05/20/2008 
5/7/2008  322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss  5/7/2008   
1/31/2008  COM - Complaint  2/4/2008   
1/31/2008  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  2/4/2008   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file