« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-053301
Judge:
Civil Court Admin, Judge
File Date:
12/7/2007
Location:
Northeast
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
First American Title Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Rex Anderson
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/1/2009
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
4/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/17/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/20/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
3/17/2009
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
3/25/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE
Filing Date
3/5/2009
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/5/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/4/2009
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
2/6/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
2/4/2009
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
2/13/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 12-11-2007
Filing Date
12/13/2007
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/17/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
12/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
12/11/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.