« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-050474
Judge:
Blanchard, John
File Date:
2/9/2007
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jeremy Drugan
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Kevin Bumstead
Party Name
Ann Marie Drugan
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Kevin Bumstead
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
John Klecan
Party Name
Keystone R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
KERRY GRIGGS
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/29/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
11/5/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/17/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
10/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
4/14/2008
Description
OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/17/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE SECOND STIPULATION
Filing Date
4/4/2008
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
4/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SECOND RE CONTINUING CASE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
3/3/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE VACATING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING CASE ON INACTIVE CALENDER
Filing Date
2/29/2008
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE VACATING TELEPHONIC SCHEUDLING CONFERENCE AND CONTINUING CASE ON INACTIVE CALENDAR
Filing Date
2/5/2008
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
2/5/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/4/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/8/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SET A COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
7/18/2007
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
7/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/1/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
6/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/31/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPLAINT/ PAID
Filing Date
5/30/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIAL APPOINTMENT TO SERVE PROCESS
Filing Date
5/16/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY R V MESA INC SERVED 4/26/07
Filing Date
4/16/2007
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
4/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/16/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/20/2007
Filing Party
Defendant(4)
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
3/26/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR SPECIAL APPOINTMENT TO SERVE PROCESS
Filing Date
2/9/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/12/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/4/2008
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.