« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-050411
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Blanchard
File Date:
2/6/2007
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Sharon Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Karla Calahan
Party Name
Mark Gloer
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Karla Calahan
Party Name
Theodore A Vavaroutso
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Holly Marshall
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2008
Description
047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/23/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2008
Description
399 - ME: Notice To File Arbit Award
Docket Date
4/30/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO CONTINUE ARBITRATION HEARING
Filing Date
1/25/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
1/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
CONTINUING ARBITRATION TIME
Filing Date
1/10/2008
Description
NOH - Notice Of Hearing
Docket Date
1/15/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ARBITRATION
Filing Date
11/30/2007
Description
324 - ME: Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator
Docket Date
11/30/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/25/2007
Description
350 - ME: Transfer To Arbitration
Docket Date
10/25/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2007
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
10/23/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/20/2007
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
9/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2007
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRECONFERENCE TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
9/13/2007
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
9/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULE 16 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
9/12/2007
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
9/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/17/2007
Description
041 - ME: Scheduling Conference Set
Docket Date
8/17/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/17/2007
Description
MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness
Docket Date
7/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2007
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
7/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/7/2007
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
3/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/9/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
2/13/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
THEODORE A VAVAROUTSO SERVED 02/12/2007
Filing Date
2/6/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
2/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
2/8/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
9/19/2007
Time
8:30
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
9/21/2007
Time
10:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/22/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
10/23/2007
Time
9:15
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.