« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-012095
Judge:
Blaney, Scott
File Date:
7/3/2007
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Keith Saunders
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Shalev Amar
Party Name
Nettie Saunders
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Shalev Amar
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
John Klecan
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/14/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/12/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
3/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/10/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AS TO AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Filing Date
2/25/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
2/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Filing Date
2/25/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
2/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
2/22/2008
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
2/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/15/2008
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
2/21/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT AMERICAN FAMILY'S IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT AND REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
1/30/2008
Description
MTA - Motion To Amend
Docket Date
2/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
1/18/2008
Description
CER - Certificate
Docket Date
1/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S RULE 26(G)
Filing Date
1/18/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
12/3/2007
Description
070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set
Docket Date
12/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/26/2007
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
10/26/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/19/2007
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
10/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT PRETRIAL
Filing Date
9/24/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
9/24/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/19/2007
Description
REQ - Request
Docket Date
9/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR A RULE 16(B) PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/28/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/30/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/28/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
8/9/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
7/26/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMERICAN FAMILY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED 7-18-07
Filing Date
7/26/2007
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/31/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV MESA INC SERVED ON 7/10/07
Filing Date
7/3/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2007
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
7/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2005
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
1/23/2008
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/14/2008
Time
9:30
Event
Civil Settlement Conference
Date
6/27/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.