« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-008285
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | Z Unassigned
File Date:
5/10/2007
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Fort McDowell Yavapai Materials
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
John Parker
Party Name
Pima Road Property L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Jostes Concrete Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Todd Jostes
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2007
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
10/26/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS PIMA ROAD PROPERTY LLC JOSTES CONCERTE AND TODD JOSTES
Filing Date
5/21/2007
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOSTES CONCRETE INC SERVED 5-11-07
Filing Date
5/21/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TODD JOSTES SERVED 5-11-07
Filing Date
5/10/2007
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
5/14/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/10/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/14/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.