« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-007986
Judge:
Arbitration 01 | McCoy
File Date:
5/7/2007
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Letricia Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Sabinus Megwa
Party Name
Stephanie Stewart
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Sabinus Megwa
Party Name
Jamon Norris
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Sabinus Megwa
Party Name
Nikkollette Dove
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Sabinus Megwa
Party Name
Brian Kian
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sean Clizbe
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/23/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/26/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SERVED BRIAN MATTHEW KINN 09/04/07
Filing Date
11/7/2007
Description
323 - ME: Jdgmnt Dismissal - Lack Srv
Docket Date
11/7/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2007
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
10/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2007
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
8/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.