« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-007827
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
5/7/2007
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
F I A Card Services N A
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Mona Naser
Party Name
John Dunatov
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Wells Fargo Bank N A
Relationship
Garnishee Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/18/2012
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
AFFIDAVIT FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT-Efile Billing $26.00
Filing Date
9/18/2012
Description
NAR - Notice Of Appearance
Docket Date
9/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
8/16/2011
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/18/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
DISCHARGING GARNISHEE
Filing Date
8/8/2011
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
8/9/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE
Filing Date
8/4/2011
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
8/5/2011
Filing Party
NOTE:
PETITION FOR ORDER DISCHARGING GARNISHEE
Filing Date
7/22/2011
Description
ANG - Answer Of Garnishee
Docket Date
7/28/2011
Filing Party
Garnishee Defendant(3)
Filing Date
7/20/2011
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/20/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/20/2011
Description
WGS - Writ Of Garnishment and Summons
Docket Date
7/21/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/14/2011
Description
AWG - Application For Writ Of Garnishment
Docket Date
7/15/2011
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2007
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
11/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
10/23/2007
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
10/26/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/23/2007
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
10/26/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/10/2007
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
10/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2007
Description
EDE - Entry Of Default
Docket Date
8/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2007
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
8/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/9/2007
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
8/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2007
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/17/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/16/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/18/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOHN DUNATOV AND JANE DOE SERVED 5/12/07
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/9/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/9/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
11/7/2007
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
F I A Card Services N A
A: John Dunatov
A: John Dunatov
Amount
$37,169.28
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
11/7/2007
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
F I A Card Services N A
A: John Dunatov
A: John Dunatov
Amount
$288.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
11/7/2007
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
F I A Card Services N A
A: John Dunatov
A: John Dunatov
Amount
$36,733.28
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified