« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-006515
Judge:
Ryan-Touhill, Jennifer
File Date:
4/13/2007
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Kori D Haley
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Timothy Casey
Party Name
Joseph Haley
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Timothy Casey
Party Name
Jane Haley
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Female
Attorney
Timothy Casey
Party Name
Brody Haley
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Timothy Casey
Party Name
Beaudry Motor Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
James Evans
Party Name
Beaudry R V Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
James Evans
Party Name
Beaudry R V Motor Company
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
James Evans
Party Name
Beaudry R V Tucson
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
BRADLEY JARDINE
Party Name
Steer Safe Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
EDWARD HOCHULI
Party Name
Gary Barnes
Relationship
Intervenor
Sex
Male
Attorney
SHANNON CLARK
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/8/2009
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
9/8/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/3/2009
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/18/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
6/26/2009
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
6/26/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/10/2009
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
6/16/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2009
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
6/11/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/4/2009
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/11/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING
Filing Date
5/11/2009
Description
REP - Report
Docket Date
5/14/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
JOINT STATUS
Filing Date
5/4/2009
Description
064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset
Docket Date
5/4/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
4/21/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
OFFER OF JUDGMENT
Filing Date
4/3/2009
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
4/3/2009
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/10/2009
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
3/19/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEENDANT BEAUDRY RV'S TO PAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR RULE 16 STATUS CONFERENCE AND MEMOARNDUM RE DATES AND DEADLINES
Filing Date
3/3/2009
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/5/2009
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' OF LIFTING OF BANKRUPTECY STAY AND REQUEST FOR A TELEPHONIC RULE 16 STATUS CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/25/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/2/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF STAY DUE TO FILING OF BANKRUPTCY BY DEFENDANTS
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
089 - ME: Trial Setting
Docket Date
11/18/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/13/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
11/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS PUNTIVE DAMAGE CLAIM AGAINST THE BEAUDRY DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
10/31/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
11/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE OF PLAINTIFFS' PUNITIVE DAMAGES CLAIM ONLY
Filing Date
10/15/2008
Description
083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont
Docket Date
10/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/14/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE
Filing Date
10/2/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
10/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/30/2008
Description
NNF - Not Of Non-Parties At Fault
Docket Date
10/2/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/29/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' OF WITHDRAWING THEIR SEPTEMBER 4 2008 MOITON TO COMPEL COMPLETE INTERROGATORY ANSWERS FROM DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV
Filing Date
9/25/2008
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNPAID
Filing Date
9/23/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/26/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV TO DISCLOSE A TIRE SPECIFIC EXPERT TO THE 31 DAY OF AUGUST 2008
Filing Date
9/19/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT'S TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
9/12/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/23/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AGAINST THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Filing Date
9/11/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
9/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
9/11/2008
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
9/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE
Filing Date
9/4/2008
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
9/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLETE INTERROGATORY ANSWERS
Filing Date
8/29/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/29/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2008
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
9/5/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION
Filing Date
8/29/2008
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/4/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/29/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO BEAUDRY RV-TUCSON'S OBJECTION TO GARY BARNES' JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
8/27/2008
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
9/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID L KURTZ/THE KURTZ LAW FIRM'S TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
9/8/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DISMISSAL WITHOUT INDIVIDUAL SIGNATURE
Filing Date
8/22/2008
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
8/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/21/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
VACATING OCOTOBER 15 2008 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/19/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
8/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
MONACO COACH CORPORATION WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
8/18/2008
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
8/22/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO GARY BARNES' JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEIR NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV COMPANY D/B/A BEADURY RV-TUCSON
Filing Date
8/15/2008
Description
025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/14/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
8/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR GARY BARNES' OF NO OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Filing Date
8/12/2008
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR GARY BARNES' JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS' IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEIR NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV COMPANY D/B/A BEAUDRY RV-TUCSON
Filing Date
8/11/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' TO DEFENDANT MEAUDRY RV'S MOTION TO DISCLOSE A TIRE SPECIFFIC EXPERT AND THAT EXPERT'S OPINIONS
Filing Date
8/8/2008
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
8/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF-INTERVENOR GARY BARNES' JOINDER IN PLAINTIFFS' PARTIAL
Filing Date
8/7/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV'S FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISCLOSE A TIRE SPECIFICE EXPERT AND THAT EXPERT'S OPINIONS
Filing Date
8/6/2008
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/8/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEIR NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV COMPANY D/B/A BEAUDRY RV-TUCSON
Filing Date
7/30/2008
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
8/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY'S CONTROVERTING MATERIAL IN DISPUTE AND SEPARATE STTEMENT OF FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/30/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' STIPULATED TO VACATE ORCTOBER 15 2008 HEARING AND RESET SAME
Filing Date
7/30/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
7/16/2008
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
7/23/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/15/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF DEFENDANTS STEER SAFE INC WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/14/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
GOODYEAR'S TO MOTION TO INTERVENE BY GARY BARNES
Filing Date
7/14/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' TO APPLICANT GARY BARNES MOTION TO INTERVENE
Filing Date
7/14/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
7/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/8/2008
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
7/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV COMPANY'S IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISLCOSE ADDITIONAL EXPERT WITNESSES AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISCLOSE ALL EXPERT OPINIONS
Filing Date
7/7/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV TO DISCLOSE ADDITIONAL EXPERT WITNESSES TO THE 30TH DAY OF JULY 2008
Filing Date
7/7/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
7/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEER SAFE INC WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
7/3/2008
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BEADRY RV'S FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL WITH CONSENT
Filing Date
7/1/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS / IN OPPOSITION TO BEAUDRY RVS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISCLOSE EXPERT WITNESSES AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISCLOSE ALL EXPERT OPINIONS
Filing Date
6/30/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RVS / FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISCLOSE ADDITIONAL WITNESSES AND / FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISCLOSE ALL EXPERT OPINIONS
Filing Date
6/30/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
7/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
/ TO MOTION TO INTERVENE
Filing Date
6/27/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF OBJECTION
Filing Date
6/25/2008
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/24/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO INTERVENE/ PAID
Filing Date
6/24/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/30/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BEADRY RV COMPANY'S OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/20/2008
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/20/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/9/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
6/13/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
6/10/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE OF MONACO COACH CORPORATION
Filing Date
5/30/2008
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND JOINT REQUEST
Filing Date
5/28/2008
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
5/28/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/21/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/21/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/21/2008
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
5/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
5/15/2008
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/19/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
5/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AGAINST TRUCK REPAIR NETWORK INC ONLY
Filing Date
5/7/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
5/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS SMITH ONLY
Filing Date
5/7/2008
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
5/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS DAVID MACIAS BRANDY MACIAS AND BIG DAVE'S TOWING & ROADSIDE SERVICE
Filing Date
5/7/2008
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/9/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS TO DEFENDANTS MACIAS AND BIG DAVE'S TOWING & ROADSIDE SERVICE ONLY
Filing Date
5/7/2008
Description
NOS - Notice Of Settlement
Docket Date
5/9/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/5/2008
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
5/8/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION COMPEL DEFENDANT GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY TO PROVIDE COMPELETE RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURES
Filing Date
5/5/2008
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
5/8/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GOODYEAR'S OF LIMITED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO VCATE COURT ORDER DATED 8/28/07
Filing Date
4/23/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
4/25/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GOODYEAR'S (1) TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURES (2) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO KORI HELEY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DUCMENTS (3) MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE RODER
Filing Date
4/15/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT MONANCO'S MOTION BE AND HEREBY IS GRANTED AND THAT MONANCO IS GARNTED A CONTINUANCE OF 60 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF PLAINTIFFS' PRODUCTION TO MONANCO OF INFORMATION RELATING TO THE INSPECTION OF THE SMITH MOTORHOME REFERRED TO IN PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT V IN ORDER FOR MONANCO TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION AND TO OBTAIN EXPERT TESTIMONY REGARDING SAME
Filing Date
4/14/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' TO VACATE THE COURT'S ORDER DATED AUGUST 28 2007 AND TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
3/25/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/24/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' WITHDRAWAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF THEIR CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT V RE MONACO'S WEIGHT IMBALANCE DEFECT
Filing Date
3/20/2008
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
3/25/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JDUGMETN ON THEIR NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV COMPANY D/B/A BEAUDRY RV-TUCSON
Filing Date
3/20/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/25/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV COMPANY'S WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICAITON FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES REGARDING FEBRUARY 7 2008 INSPECTION AND NOTICE OF SATISFACTION
Filing Date
3/20/2008
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
3/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIAL/ ON THEIR NINTH CAUSE OF ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT BEAUDRY RV COMPANY DBA BEAUDRY RV TUCSON
Filing Date
3/18/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS WITHDRAWAL OF THEIR APPLICATION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES REGARDING FEBRUARY 7 2008 INSPECTION GIVEN GOODYEAR'S PAYMENT OF SANCTION
Filing Date
3/13/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEER SAFE'S WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICATION FOR COSTS AND ATTORNEYS FEES REGARDING FEBRUARY 7 2008 INSPECTION
Filing Date
3/12/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT TRUCK REPAIR NETWORK'S WITHDRAWAL OF APPLICAITON FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES INCIDENT TO FEBRUARY 7 2008 INSPECTION
Filing Date
3/6/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
ENLARGING TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF KORI D HALEY'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST SET OF ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT DAVE MACIAS D/B/A BIG DAVE'S TOWNING AND ROADSIDE SERVICE
Filing Date
2/29/2008
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
3/5/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
BY DEFENDANT TRUCK REPAIR NETWORK FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES INCIDENT TO FEBRUARY 7 2008 INSPECTION
Filing Date
2/29/2008
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
3/5/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEER SAFE'S FEBRUARY 7 2008 INSPECTION
Filing Date
2/26/2008
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
2/28/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT BEARUDRY MOTOR COMPANY'S REGARDING FEBRUARY 7 2008 INSPECTION
Filing Date
2/19/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S TO DEFENDANT MONACO COACH CORPORATION'S RULE 56(F) MOTION
Filing Date
2/19/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/21/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' TO THE COURT REGARDING THEIR PENDING MOTIONS TO COMPEL AGAINST GOODYEAR AND REQUEST FOR RULING ON LIMITED AREAS OF DISPUTE STILL REMAINING
Filing Date
2/19/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/ TO ENLARGE TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST SET OF ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT DAVE MACIAS DBA BIG DAVES TOWING AND ROADSIDE SERVICE
Filing Date
2/15/2008
Description
AAF - Application For Attorney Fees
Docket Date
2/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS'
Filing Date
2/15/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/26/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT MONACO TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND RESCHEDULING ORAL ARGUMENT
Filing Date
2/14/2008
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
2/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT MONACO COACH CORPORATIONS/ PURSUANT TO RULE 56(F)
Filing Date
2/12/2008
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
2/12/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/20/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
SCHEDULING
Filing Date
2/7/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT THE STATUS QUO REGARDING THE GOODYEAR TREAD PIECE AND ITS CONNECTION TO THE VEHICLE WILL NOT IN ANY WAY BE CHANGED ALTERED OF MODIFIED UNTIL GOODYEAR'S EXPERT CAN BE PRESENT ON FEBRUARY 14 2008
Filing Date
2/7/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
2/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEER SAFE INC'S TO GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/7/2008
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
2/12/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
MONACO'S IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT V
Filing Date
2/6/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/11/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
GOODYEAR'S EMERGENCY FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
2/1/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
2/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' WITHDRAWAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ITS MOTION TO VACATE THE COURT'S ORDER DATED AUGUST 28 2007 AND TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS/MOTION TO SEAL THE FOREGOING MOTION PENDING APPEAL IN THE PHILLIPS CASE
Filing Date
1/31/2008
Description
MVJ - Motion To Vacate Judgment
Docket Date
2/7/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFF'S DATED AUGUST 28 2007 AND TO UNSEAL DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
1/31/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
2/6/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT MONACO TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/22/2008
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/22/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2008
Description
MEM - Memorandum
Docket Date
1/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE PARTIES' JOINT PRETRIAL AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
1/16/2008
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/18/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE PLAINTIFFS' SUPPORT FOR THEIR PROPOSED DATES IN THE CONTEMPORANEOUSLY FILED PROPOSED JOINT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM AND SCHEDULING ORDER
Filing Date
1/10/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
1/15/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MONACO COACH CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT V OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT/PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMETN ON COUNT V
Filing Date
1/10/2008
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
1/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MONACO COACH CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT V OF PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT/PLAINTIFFS' CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT V
Filing Date
12/26/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID / TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
12/5/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
12/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/3/2007
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
12/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/27/2007
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
12/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT STEER SAFE INC'S
Filing Date
11/27/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED, PAID
Filing Date
11/27/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST AMENDED
Filing Date
11/27/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
11/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS CERTIFICATE REGARDING COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
11/21/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' RENEWED FOR A RULE 16 COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
11/1/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
11/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
BIG DAVES TOWING AND DAVE MACIAS SERVED ON 10/29/2007
Filing Date
10/29/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/2/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDMENT TO ITS/
Filing Date
10/24/2007
Description
OFS - Order for Substitution of Counsel
Docket Date
11/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
10/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF RETIREMENT
Filing Date
10/23/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEPARATE/ TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/22/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Filing Date
10/22/2007
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
10/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE/ FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
10/17/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
10/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
STEER SAFE INC SERVED 10/12/07
Filing Date
10/11/2007
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
10/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
10/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/11/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/9/2007
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
10/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL AS AGAINST DEFENDANT MONACO COACH CORPORATION
Filing Date
10/9/2007
Description
AMC - Amended Complaint
Docket Date
10/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FIRST
Filing Date
10/5/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
10/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/1/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND
Filing Date
9/26/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL
Filing Date
9/19/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS RULE 56(F) MOTION
Filing Date
9/19/2007
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
9/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NO OPPOSITION TO THEIR 08/17/07 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Filing Date
9/13/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
9/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2007
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
10/1/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/12/2007
Description
SDD - Notice: Sealed Document
Docket Date
10/1/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/11/2007
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
9/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS V VI AND VII
Filing Date
9/7/2007
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
9/12/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AS AGAINST DEFENDANT MONACO COACH CORPORATION
Filing Date
9/6/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
9/12/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
STIPULATED/ TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT PRE-TRIAL MEMORANDUM
Filing Date
8/30/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
9/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SEALING THE FOLLOWING PORTIONS OF THE COURT RECORD UNDER THE PROTECTIVE ORDER ENTERED IN THIS ACTION
Filing Date
8/30/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
9/4/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO MONACO COACH CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
8/30/2007
Description
MCO - Motion To Continue
Docket Date
9/4/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
RULING ON MONACO COACH CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT V TO ALLOW DEPOSITION AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY FROM MONACO
Filing Date
8/30/2007
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
9/4/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND
Filing Date
8/27/2007
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
8/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PARTIAL AS TO COUNT V
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
8/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
COUNTS V, VI AND VII
Filing Date
8/24/2007
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
8/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
MATERIAL/ IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT V
Filing Date
8/23/2007
Description
SDO - Order to Seal Documents
Docket Date
8/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS POSITION AND ARGUMENTS AT PAGE 13 OF THE MOTION TO COMPEL AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM THAT PERTAINS TO SECTION III (C)(3)(D)-(F) AND EXHIBIT 5 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF KORI HALEY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
8/20/2007
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
8/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL TIRES
Filing Date
8/17/2007
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
9/4/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF KORI D HALEY'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Filing Date
8/17/2007
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
8/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY TO PROVIDE COMPLETE RULE 26.1 DISCLOSURES
Filing Date
8/17/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Filing Date
8/13/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO GOODYEARS MOTION TO SEAL
Filing Date
8/10/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
8/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/10/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/14/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO DEFENDANT GOODYEARS MOTION TO COMPEL TIRES
Filing Date
8/9/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO SEAL
Filing Date
8/7/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/9/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANT SMITH'S TO MOTION TO COMPEL TIRES
Filing Date
8/6/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
8/8/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFFS' FOR A RULE 16 COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Filing Date
8/1/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CERTIFICATE ON COMPULSORY ARBITRATION
Filing Date
8/1/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
8/2/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/23/2007
Description
MTC - Motion To Compel
Docket Date
7/26/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER CO'S
Filing Date
7/20/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
7/12/2007
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
7/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGAINST DEFENDANT TRUCK REPAIR NETWORK INC
Filing Date
7/12/2007
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
7/17/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF TIMOTHY J CASEY ESQ
Filing Date
7/3/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
7/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PROTECTIVE
Filing Date
6/25/2007
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
6/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Filing Date
6/20/2007
Description
029 - ME: Status Conference
Docket Date
6/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PLAINTIFS' EMERGENCY TO ALLOW THEIR COUNSEL TO ATTEN THE JUNE 22 2007 DEPOSTION OF JOHN MCCORMICK AND QUESTION THE WITNESS/MOTION FOR ACCELERATED BRIEFING AND RULING
Filing Date
6/15/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
6/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/11/2007
Description
REL - Reply
Docket Date
6/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY'S IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
6/5/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
6/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO COMPLAINT/ PAID
Filing Date
6/5/2007
Description
CAA - Cert Of Agreement/Arbitration
Docket Date
6/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/5/2007
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
6/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/29/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY RV COMPANY SERVED 5/9/07
Filing Date
5/29/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
BEAUDRY MOTOR COMPANY SERVED 5/9/07
Filing Date
5/25/2007
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
5/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOODYEARS MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/22/2007
Description
NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trial
Docket Date
5/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/22/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID
Filing Date
5/15/2007
Description
ACS - Acceptance Of Service
Docket Date
5/16/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DOUGLAS B SMITH AND BARBARA J SMITH SERVED 5/15/07
Filing Date
5/8/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRUCK REPAIR NETWORK INC SERVED 4-20-07
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID, MOTION TO DISMISS
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/8/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
MONACO COACH CORPORATION SERVED 4/27/07
Filing Date
5/7/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
5/9/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
4/27/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY SERVED 4/17/07
Filing Date
4/13/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
4/17/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2007
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
4/17/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/19/2007
Time
9:5
Event
Status Conference
Date
11/30/2007
Time
9:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/7/2008
Time
11:15
Event
Oral Argument
Date
2/29/2008
Time
14:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
3/21/2008
Time
11:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
6/27/2008
Time
13:30
Event
Oral Argument
Date
9/26/2008
Time
15:00
Event
Oral Argument
Date
10/15/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
10/27/2008
Time
8:55
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
11/17/2008
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
4/27/2009
Time
8:45
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
5/26/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Date
7/7/2009
Time
9:00
Event
Pre-Trial Conference
Date
8/3/2009
Time
9:30
Event
Trial
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.