Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2007-004793 | Judge: | Hannah, John |
File Date: | 3/16/2007 | Location: | Downtown |
Case Type: | Civil |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
City Of Phoenix | Plaintiff | Charles Ayers | |
Elizabeth O Garretson | Defendant | Female | Pro Per |
John E Garretson | Defendant | Male | Dale Zeitlin |
Maricopa County | Defendant | Steven Palmer | |
Maricopa County Creditor | In The Matter Of (IMO) | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
6/15/2018 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 6/15/2018 | |
5/22/2018 | REL - Reply | 5/24/2018 | |
NOTE: City's Reply Re Summation | |||
5/18/2018 | RES - Response | 5/22/2018 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO CITY’S REPORT AND SUMMATION | |||
5/11/2018 | REP - Report | 5/14/2018 | |
NOTE: City's Report and Summation | |||
12/22/2017 | ORD - Order | 12/22/2017 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: POST-TRIAL DISCOVERY | |||
12/8/2017 | REL - Reply | 12/8/2017 | |
NOTE: CITY’S REPLY RE: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |||
12/1/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 12/1/2017 | |
11/28/2017 | RQH - Request For Hearing | 11/29/2017 | |
NOTE: Response to City's Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Hearing | |||
11/17/2017 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 11/17/2017 | |
NOTE: City's Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Ruling | |||
9/29/2017 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 9/29/2017 | |
NOTE: Joint Status Report Re: Post-Judgment Discovery | |||
9/21/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 9/21/2017 | |
9/20/2017 | RES - Response | 9/21/2017 | |
NOTE: City's Response to Motion to Strike | |||
9/15/2017 | MOT - Motion | 9/18/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion to Strike City's Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Ruling | |||
9/13/2017 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 9/15/2017 | |
NOTE: City's Motion to Compel Discovery and Request for Expedited Ruling | |||
8/4/2017 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 8/4/2017 | |
7/20/2017 | RES - Response | 7/24/2017 | |
NOTE: Response to City's Supplemental Memorandum | |||
7/18/2017 | MEM - Memorandum | 7/19/2017 | |
NOTE: City's Supplemental Memorandum and Request for Oral Argument | |||
7/11/2017 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 7/12/2017 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Declaration of Riley Schwenn | |||
6/28/2017 | REL - Reply | 6/29/2017 | |
NOTE: City's Reply to Defendant Garretson's Response to Motion for Relief From Final Judgment | |||
6/16/2017 | RES - Response | 6/19/2017 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT | |||
6/6/2017 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 6/7/2017 | |
5/26/2017 | MOT - Motion | 5/30/2017 | |
NOTE: Motion for Relief From Final Judgment | |||
3/13/2017 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 3/14/2017 | |
NOTE: Satisfaction of Judgment | |||
1/3/2017 | OVJ - Order Vacating Judgment | 1/6/2017 | |
NOTE: FOR JURY FEES | |||
12/9/2016 | ORD - Order | 12/9/2016 | |
NOTE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED vacating the Judgment for Jury Fees entered on or about October 26, 2016. | |||
12/1/2016 | STJ - Stipulated Judgment | 12/1/2016 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED JUDGMENT | |||
12/1/2016 | MSA - Motion To Set Aside Judgment | 12/2/2016 | |
NOTE: Motion to Set Aside Judgment for Jury Fees | |||
11/14/2016 | NOT - Notice | 11/15/2016 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSED JUDGMENT | |||
11/3/2016 | EXW - Exhibits Work Sheet | 11/7/2016 | |
11/2/2016 | NOT - Notice | 11/3/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Lodging Judgment | |||
11/2/2016 | SOC - Statement Of Costs | 11/3/2016 | |
NOTE: defendants Statement of Costs | |||
10/28/2016 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/28/2016 | |
10/27/2016 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/27/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | VER - Verdict | 11/2/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | VER - Verdict | 11/2/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
NOTE: RESPONSE TO / | |||
10/26/2016 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 | 11/10/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | JUL - Jury List - Restricted if Filed after 1/1/2008 | 11/10/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | JJF - Judgment For Jury Fees | 11/14/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
10/26/2016 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/26/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/26/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/26/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/26/2016 | |
10/26/2016 | WSH - Worksheet | 11/2/2016 | |
NOTE: TRIAL/HEARING / | |||
10/25/2016 | JIN - Jury Instructions | 11/2/2016 | |
NOTE: FINAL / | |||
10/25/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/25/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/25/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/24/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/21/2016 | REQ - Request | 10/24/2016 | |
NOTE: Request for Jury Instruction RE:TCE | |||
10/20/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/20/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/20/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/20/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/19/2016 | 012 - ME: Trial | 10/19/2016 | |
10/18/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/18/2016 | JQU - Jury Question | 11/2/2016 | |
10/17/2016 | JIN - Jury Instructions | 11/2/2016 | |
NOTE: PRELIMINARY | |||
10/13/2016 | MEM - Memorandum | 10/14/2016 | |
NOTE: Plaintiff's Trial Memorandum to the Court Re Motions in Limine; Exhibit 18 (Collision Report); Witness Ralston; and Additional Objections to Specific Exhibits | |||
10/10/2016 | 331 - ME: Settlement Conference | 10/10/2016 | |
10/3/2016 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 10/3/2016 | |
9/20/2016 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference | 9/20/2016 | |
9/15/2016 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 9/16/2016 | |
NOTE: Garretson's Objection to City's Supplemental Jury Instructions Re Determining Damages | |||
9/13/2016 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 9/14/2016 | |
NOTE: City's Proposed Supplemental Jury Instruction | |||
9/12/2016 | NOT - Notice | 9/13/2016 | |
NOTE: Citys Proposed Voir Dire Questions for the Court (Corrected) | |||
9/9/2016 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 9/12/2016 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT’S PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS AND FORM OF VERDICT | |||
9/9/2016 | NOT - Notice | 9/12/2016 | |
NOTE: City's Proposed Voir Dire Questions | |||
9/9/2016 | PJI - Proposed Jury Instructions | 9/12/2016 | |
NOTE: City's Proposed RAJI and Non-RAJI Instructions and Defendant's Objections | |||
9/9/2016 | STA - Statement | 9/12/2016 | |
NOTE: JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT | |||
9/9/2016 | NOT - Notice | 9/12/2016 | |
NOTE: Defendant's Proposed Voir Dire | |||
9/2/2016 | NOT - Notice | 9/2/2016 | |
NOTE: Withdrawal of Request for Pretrial Ruling and Expedited Hearing | |||
9/1/2016 | REQ - Request | 9/2/2016 | |
NOTE: Request for Pretrial Ruling and Expedited Hearing | |||
8/16/2016 | NOT - Notice | 8/16/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Attorney Substitution Within the Firm | |||
8/3/2016 | NOT - Notice | 8/4/2016 | |
NOTE: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS | |||
7/12/2016 | 025 - ME: Case Status Minute Entry | 7/12/2016 | |
3/8/2016 | ORD - Order | 3/8/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: MOTION TO PERMIT REBUTTAL EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, EXHIBITS AND MOTIONS REGARDING DEFENDANT’S “VIDEO DEMONSTRATION”; IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE | |||
2/26/2016 | 064 - ME: Trial Continued/Reset | 2/26/2016 | |
2/23/2016 | REL - Reply | 2/23/2016 | |
NOTE: REPLY RE: MOTION TO PERMIT REBUTTAL EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, EXHIBITS AND MOTIONS REGARDING DEFENDANT’S “VIDEO DEMONSTRATION”; IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE | |||
2/23/2016 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 2/23/2016 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Proposed Order Continuing Trial Date and Pretrial Deadlines | |||
2/19/2016 | RES - Response | 2/19/2016 | |
NOTE: Response ro Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Rebuttal Evidence, Testimony, Exhibits and Motions Regarding Defendant's "Video Demonstration"; in the Alternative Motion to Continue Trial | |||
2/4/2016 | MOT - Motion | 2/4/2016 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO PERMIT REBUTTAL EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY, EXHIBITS AND MOTIONS REGARDING DEFENDANT’S “VIDEO DEMONSTRATION”; IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE | |||
1/5/2016 | ORD - Order | 1/5/2016 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: MOTION TO PERMIT GARRETSON TO PRODUCE DEMONSTRATIVE VIDEO OF ACCESS | |||
12/29/2015 | RES - Response | 12/30/2015 | |
NOTE: Response to Plaintiff's Supplement to Response to Motion to Permit Demonstrative Video; Request for Sanctions | |||
12/18/2015 | RES - Response | 12/18/2015 | |
NOTE: Supplement to Response to Motion to Permit Demonstrative Video; Request for Sanctions | |||
12/17/2015 | REL - Reply | 12/17/2015 | |
NOTE: Reply in Support of Motion to Permit Garretson to Produce Demonstrative Video of Access | |||
12/11/2015 | RES - Response | 12/11/2015 | |
NOTE: Response to Motion to Permit Demonstrative Video | |||
12/3/2015 | 089 - ME: Trial Setting | 12/3/2015 | |
11/20/2015 | MOT - Motion | 11/23/2015 | |
NOTE: Motion to Permit Garretson to Produce Demonstrative Video of Access | |||
10/26/2015 | PDO - Proposed Order Denied | 10/26/2015 | |
NOTE: PROPOSED ORDER DENIED | |||
10/9/2015 | ORD - Order | 10/9/2015 | |
NOTE: ORDERED that the parties, their counsel and all witnesses shall refrain from discussing or referring to the appellate proceedings in this case or the decisions of either the Arizona Court of Appeals or Supreme Court in any way, either directly or indirectly. | |||
9/18/2015 | RES - Response | 9/21/2015 | |
NOTE: Garretson's Response to City of Phoenix's Motion in Limine: Untimely Produced Traffic Studies and Other Evidence | |||
9/9/2015 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 9/10/2015 | |
NOTE: City of Phoenix's Motion in Limine Re: Untimely Produced Traffic Studies and Other Evidence | |||
8/28/2015 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 8/28/2015 | |
NOTE: City of Phoenix's Motion in Limine Re: References to Appellate Decisions | |||
7/1/2015 | ORD - Order | 7/1/2015 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: CITY OF PHOENIX’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE CITY’S ACQUISITION OF THE WOODWARD PARCEL | |||
6/25/2015 | ORD - Order | 6/25/2015 | |
NOTE: Order RE: City of Phoenix's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's "Conceptual Development Plans" | |||
6/19/2015 | RES - Response | 6/19/2015 | |
NOTE: Response to Motion to Strike Motion in Limine | |||
6/8/2015 | RES - Response | 6/8/2015 | |
NOTE: Garretsons' Response in Opposition to City of Phoenix's Motion in limine to Exclude Evidence of the City's Acquistion of the Woodward Parcel and Motion to Strike the Motion in limine for not complying with Rule 7.2 ARCP | |||
6/8/2015 | RES - Response | 6/9/2015 | |
NOTE: Garretsons' response in opposition to city of phoenix's motion in limine to exclude evidence of the city's acquisition of the woodward parcel and motion to strike the motion in limine for not complying with rule 7.2 arcp | |||
5/20/2015 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 5/20/2015 | |
NOTE: City of Phoenix's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Defendant's "Conceptual Development Plans" | |||
5/20/2015 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 5/20/2015 | |
NOTE: City of Phoenix's Motion in Limine To Exclude Evidence of The City's Acquisition of the Woodward Parcel | |||
5/12/2015 | ORD - Order | 5/12/2015 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL RE: REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND FOR INSPECTING, TESTING AND SAMPLING | |||
5/8/2015 | ORD - Order | 5/8/2015 | |
NOTE: ORDER RE: CITY OF PHOENIX’S MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE CITY’S PRE-FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
5/6/2015 | REL - Reply | 5/6/2015 | |
NOTE: Reply Re: Motion to Compel Re: Request for Entry Upon Land for Inspecting, Testing and Sampling | |||
4/29/2015 | RES - Response | 4/29/2015 | |
NOTE: Garretsons' Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Re: Request for Entry Upon Land for Inspecting and Sampling | |||
4/16/2015 | MTC - Motion To Compel | 4/17/2015 | |
NOTE: Motion to Compel Re: Request for Entry Upon Land for Inspecting, Testing and Sampling | |||
4/3/2015 | RES - Response | 4/6/2015 | |
NOTE: Garretson's Response to City's Motion in Limine to Exclude Offers to Purchase and Supporting Appraisals | |||
3/17/2015 | MIL - Motion In Limine | 3/18/2015 | |
NOTE: City of Phoenix's Motion in Limine to Exclude City's Pre-Filing Offers to Purchase and Supporting Appraisals | |||
2/27/2015 | REQ - Request | 3/2/2015 | |
NOTE: Request for Entry Upon Land for Inspecting, Testing and Sampling | |||
10/2/2014 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/2/2014 | |
10/1/2014 | SCO – Scheduling Order | 10/1/2014 | |
NOTE: SCHEDULING ORDER | |||
9/30/2014 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 10/2/2014 | |
9/30/2014 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 10/2/2014 | |
NOTE: FEES | |||
9/11/2014 | JSR – Joint Scheduling Report | 9/12/2014 | |
NOTE: Joint Report | |||
8/22/2014 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 8/22/2014 | |
8/19/2014 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 8/19/2014 | |
5/7/2014 | TSP - Transcript of Proceedings | 5/9/2014 | |
NOTE: SALLY STEARMAN/AUGUST 18 2009 | |||
5/7/2014 | ALT - Appeals Letter Of Transmittal | 5/19/2014 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT | |||
5/7/2014 | MAN - Order Of Mandate | 5/19/2014 | |
NOTE: SUPREME COURT/APPEAL IS VACATED AND CASE IS REMANDED TO THE SUPERIOR COURT FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS | |||
11/26/2013 | LET - Letter | 11/27/2013 | |
3/31/2011 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 4/4/2011 | |
3/25/2011 | LET - Letter | 3/25/2011 | |
3/14/2011 | CAO - Court Of Appeals Order | 3/14/2011 | |
NOTE: SHALL TRANSMIT THE RECORD ON APPEAL TO CLERK OF COURT OF APPEALS BEFORE MARCH 25, 2011 | |||
10/12/2010 | MOT - Motion | 10/13/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR FILING OPENING BRIEF | |||
10/7/2010 | AIX - Appeals Index | 10/8/2010 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL #1 | |||
9/27/2010 | CAS - Civil Appeals Docketing Statement | 9/30/2010 | |
9/17/2010 | CAR - Court Of Appeals Receipt | 9/17/2010 | |
9/17/2010 | LET - Letter | 9/17/2010 | |
NOTE: COA/FILING FEE DUE | |||
9/7/2010 | LET - Letter | 9/7/2010 | |
NOTE: CERTIFICATION | |||
9/7/2010 | AIX - Appeals Index | 9/7/2010 | |
8/26/2010 | SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment | 9/1/2010 | |
NOTE: AND RECEIPT | |||
7/30/2010 | NDC - Notice Of Deposit With Court | 8/6/2010 | |
NOTE: $500.00 FOR APPEAL BOND FOR JOHN E GARRETSON | |||
7/28/2010 | NAP - Notice Of Appeal | 7/30/2010 | |
7/16/2010 | STJ - Stipulated Judgment | 7/23/2010 | |
NOTE: Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties | |||
7/9/2010 | STP - Stipulation | 7/15/2010 | |
NOTE: TO AMEND CAPTION AND TO ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND REQUEST TO VACATE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE | |||
5/3/2010 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 5/3/2010 | |
4/29/2010 | ORD - Order | 5/6/2010 | |
NOTE: CONTINUING PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
4/14/2010 | STP - Stipulation | 4/16/2010 | |
NOTE: FOR ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
3/29/2010 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 3/29/2010 | |
3/3/2010 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 3/3/2010 | |
3/2/2010 | ORD - Order | 3/9/2010 | |
NOTE: TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINES | |||
2/25/2010 | STP - Stipulation | 2/25/2010 | |
NOTE: to Extend Discovery Deadlines | |||
1/12/2010 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 1/12/2010 | |
1/11/2010 | ORD - Order | 1/14/2010 | |
NOTE: CONTINUING PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
1/7/2010 | STP - Stipulation | 1/12/2010 | |
NOTE: TO VACATE ORAL ARGUMENT ON REMAINING PENDING MOTIONS AND FORENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
1/6/2010 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 1/6/2010 | |
12/11/2009 | REL - Reply | 12/16/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY'S IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF FILING PHOTOGRAPHS SHOWING ACCESS TO SUBJECT PROPERTY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE ACCESS | |||
12/8/2009 | RES - Response | 12/11/2009 | |
NOTE: GARRESTON'S TO THE CITY'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING PHOTOGRAPHS SHOWING ACCESS TO SUBJECT PROPERTY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE ACCESS | |||
12/4/2009 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 12/9/2009 | |
NOTE: ORIGINAL AFFIDAVIT OF SHEILA RALSTON IN SUPPORT OF CITY'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING PHOTOGRAPHS SHOWING ACCESS TO SUBJECT PROPERTY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE ACCESS | |||
12/2/2009 | MOT - Motion | 12/7/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY'S TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF FILING PHOTOGRAPHS SHOWING ACCESS TO SUBJECT PROPERTY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDEARTION RE ACCESS | |||
11/27/2009 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 11/27/2009 | |
11/25/2009 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 12/1/2009 | |
NOTE: PHOTOGRAPHS SHOWING ACCESS TO SUBJECT PROPERTY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE ACCESS | |||
11/23/2009 | REQ - Request | 11/30/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY'S FOR ENTRY OF ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
11/2/2009 | RES - Response | 11/6/2009 | |
NOTE: TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO CITY'S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT | |||
11/2/2009 | RES - Response | 11/6/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO CITY'S STATEMENT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LEGAL INADMISSABILTY OF CITY'S PRE FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
11/2/2009 | REL - Reply | 11/6/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LEGAL INADMISSIBILITY OF CITY'S PRE FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPRTING APPRAISALS | |||
11/2/2009 | REL - Reply | 11/6/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S COMBINED/IN SUPPORT OF CITY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT AND RESPONSE TO DEFNDANTS CROSS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE DEFENDANTS ARE ENTITLED TO DAMAGES DURING THE THREE YEAR PERIOD OF THE IRREVOCABLE RIGHT OF ENTRY AGREEMENT | |||
11/2/2009 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 11/9/2009 | |
NOTE: TO COMBINED STATEMENT OF FACTS | |||
10/16/2009 | RES - Response | 10/26/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S TO GARRETSONS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
10/14/2009 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/14/2009 | |
10/13/2009 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 10/20/2009 | |
NOTE: MARK M GRUMLEY DECLARATION | |||
10/13/2009 | RES - Response | 10/20/2009 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT DEFENDANTS ARE ENTITLED TO DAMAGES DURING THREE YEAR PERIOD OF THE IRREVOCABLE RIGHT OF ENTRY AGREEMENT | |||
10/13/2009 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 10/20/2009 | |
NOTE: JOHN GARRETSON DECLARATION | |||
10/13/2009 | RES - Response | 10/20/2009 | |
NOTE: TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LEGAL INADMISSIBILITY OF PREFILNG OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
10/13/2009 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 10/20/2009 | |
NOTE: GARRETSONS' COMBINED/IN OPPOSITION TO 1 CITY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LEGAL INADMISSIBILITY OF CITY'S PRE FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS AND 2 THE CITY'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DADMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCITON EASEMENT | |||
10/13/2009 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/20/2009 | |
NOTE: TO CITY OF PHOENIX'S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JDUGMENT REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRCUTION EASEMENT | |||
10/13/2009 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 10/20/2009 | |
NOTE: TO CITY OF PHOENIX'S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LEGAL INADMISSIABILITY OF CITY'S PRE FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
10/9/2009 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 10/19/2009 | |
NOTE: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF GARRETSONS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |||
10/6/2009 | 023 - ME: Order Entered By Court | 10/6/2009 | |
9/24/2009 | MFR - Motion For Reconsideration | 9/29/2009 | |
9/9/2009 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 9/14/2009 | |
NOTE: PARTIAL/REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT | |||
9/9/2009 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 9/14/2009 | |
NOTE: PARTIAL/ON LEGAL INADMISSIBILITY OF CITY'S PRE FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
9/9/2009 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 9/14/2009 | |
NOTE: IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT | |||
8/28/2009 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 8/28/2009 | |
8/20/2009 | RES - Response | 8/25/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S/TO GARRETSON'S SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY ON LOSS OF ACCESS DAMAGES | |||
8/19/2009 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 8/19/2009 | |
8/19/2009 | ORD - Order | 8/25/2009 | |
NOTE: EXTENDING ORAL ARGUMENT SCHEDULED FOR 8/17/09 | |||
8/6/2009 | REQ - Request | 8/13/2009 | |
NOTE: JOINT/FOR EXTENDED ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
7/13/2009 | 021 - ME: Nunc Pro Tunc Order | 7/13/2009 | |
7/1/2009 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 7/1/2009 | |
6/16/2009 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 6/16/2009 | |
6/12/2009 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 6/12/2009 | |
6/12/2009 | REQ - Request | 6/16/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S FOR COURT REPORTER | |||
6/8/2009 | RES - Response | 6/12/2009 | |
NOTE: TO GARRETSONS MOTION TO STRIKE THE CITYS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF 1.CITYS ACQUISITIONOF THE WOODWARD PARCEL AND 2.DEFENDANTS CONCEPTUAL DEVELOPMENT PLANS AND CITYS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF THE CITY PREFIL | |||
6/1/2009 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 6/1/2009 | |
5/27/2009 | RES - Response | 6/2/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX TO DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS | |||
5/27/2009 | REL - Reply | 6/2/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SERVERANCE DAMAGES | |||
5/21/2009 | MOT - Motion | 5/28/2009 | |
NOTE: GARRETSONS' TO STRIKE CITY OF PHOENIX'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF I CITY'S ACQUISITION OF THE WOODWARD PARCEL AND II DEFENDANTS' CONCEPTUAL DEVELOPMENT PLANS AND CITY OF PHOENIX'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CITY'S PREFILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
5/20/2009 | REL - Reply | 5/22/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CITY'S PRE-FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
5/19/2009 | REL - Reply | 5/22/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF I CITY'S ACQUISITION OF THE WOODWARD PARCEL AND II DEFENDANTS CONCEPTUAL DEVELOPMENT PLANS | |||
5/18/2009 | REL - Reply | 5/21/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHONENIX'S IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEGAL RULING REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT | |||
5/8/2009 | ORD - Order | 5/13/2009 | |
NOTE: RE EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO THE FOLLWOING MOTIONS FILED BY THE CITY CITY OF PHOENIX'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JDUGMENT ON SEVERANCE DAMAGES CITY OF PHOENIX'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CITY'S PRE FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS CITY OF PHOENIX'S MOTION FOR LEGAL RULING REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT AND CITY OF PHOENIX'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF I CITY'S ACQUISITION OF THE WOODWARD PARCEL AND II DEFENDANTS' CONCEPTUAL DEVELOPMENT PLANS | |||
5/7/2009 | RES - Response | 5/12/2009 | |
NOTE: GARRETSONS' IN OPPOSITION TO CITY OF PHOENIX'S MOTION IN LIMINE TO ESCLUDE EVIDENCE OF I CITY'S ACQUISITION OF THE WOODWARD PARCEL AND II DEFENDANTS' CONCEPTUAL DEVLEOPMENT PLANS | |||
5/7/2009 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 5/12/2009 | |
NOTE: OF THE JOHN GARRETSON DECLARATION | |||
5/7/2009 | RES - Response | 5/12/2009 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' TO CITY OF PHOENIX'S MOTION FOR LEGAL RULING REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR LEGAL RULING THAT THE DEFENDANTS ARE ENTITLED TO DAMAGES DURING THE THREE YEAR PERIOD OF THE IRREVOCABLE RIGHT | |||
5/7/2009 | RES - Response | 5/12/2009 | |
NOTE: GARRETSONS' TO CITY OF PHOENIX'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SERVERANCE | |||
5/7/2009 | RES - Response | 5/12/2009 | |
NOTE: GARRETSONS' TO CITY OF PHOENIX'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CITY'S PRE-FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
5/7/2009 | RES - Response | 5/12/2009 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANTS' TO CITY OF PHOENIX'S STATEMENT OF FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SEVERANCE DAMAGES AND DEFENDANTS' SEPARATE STATEMENT OF FACTS WHICH ESTANBLISH A GENUINE ISSUE OF MATERIAL FACT AND PRECLUDE SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN | |||
5/6/2009 | RES - Response | 5/11/2009 | |
NOTE: TO CITY OF PHOENIXS MOTION FOR LEGAL RULING REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR LEGAL RULING THAT THE DEFENDANTS ARE ENTITLED TO DAMAGES DURING THE THREE YEAR PERIOD OF THE IRREVOCABLE RIGHT OF ENTRY AGRE | |||
5/6/2009 | 083 - ME: Conference Reset/Cont | 5/6/2009 | |
5/4/2009 | MOT - Motion | 5/6/2009 | |
NOTE: JOINT / AND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS FILED BY THE CITY / FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SEVERANCE / TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CITYS PREFILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS / FOR LEGAL RULING REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT AND / TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CITYS ACQUISITION OF THE WOODWARD PARCEL AND CONCEPTUAL DEVELOPMENT PLANS | |||
4/15/2009 | MOT - Motion | 4/21/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF 1 CITY'S ACQUISTION OF THE WOODWARD PARCEL AND II DEFENDANTS' CONCEPTUAL DEVELOPMENT PLANS | |||
3/31/2009 | MOT - Motion | 4/3/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S FOR LEGAL RULING REGARDING DAMAGES RECOVERABLE FOR TEMPORARY CONSTRUCTION EASEMENT | |||
3/23/2009 | MOT - Motion | 3/26/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENXI'S TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF CITY'S PRE-FILING OFFERS TO PURCHASE AND SUPPORTING APPRAISALS | |||
3/13/2009 | MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment | 3/18/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S PARTIAL ON SEVERANCE DAMAGES | |||
3/13/2009 | SOF - Statement Of Facts | 3/19/2009 | |
NOTE: CITY OF PHOENIX'S IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SEVERANCE DAMAGES | |||
12/22/2008 | ORD - Order | 12/29/2008 | |
NOTE: CONTINUING PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
12/9/2008 | REL - Reply | 12/15/2008 | |
NOTE: CITY'S RE MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND CITY'S MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING 1 PAUL BASHA B OPIONIONS BY MARK GRUMLEY AND C DISCOVERY RELATED TO WOODWARD ACQUISITION | |||
11/26/2008 | RES - Response | 12/3/2008 | |
NOTE: DEFENDANT'S TO MOTION TO CONTINUE PRETRIAL DEADLINES AND MOTION FOR RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE | |||
11/12/2008 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 11/17/2008 | |
NOTE: PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
8/13/2008 | ORD - Order | 8/14/2008 | |
NOTE: AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
8/7/2008 | APL - Application | 8/13/2008 | |
NOTE: FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |||
7/17/2008 | ORD - Order | 7/23/2008 | |
NOTE: CONTINUING TELEPHONIC TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
7/14/2008 | MCO - Motion To Continue | 7/17/2008 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED/TELEPHONIC TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE AND PRETRIAL DEADLINES | |||
6/4/2008 | ORD - Order | 6/10/2008 | |
NOTE: REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF INFORMATION DISCLOSED OR PRODUCED IN LITIGATION | |||
5/29/2008 | ORD - Order | 6/5/2008 | |
NOTE: STIPULATED/REGARDING CONFIDENTIALITY OF INFORMATION DISCLOSED OR PRODUCED IN LITIGATION | |||
2/27/2008 | 027 - ME: Pretrial Conference | 2/27/2008 | |
2/20/2008 | STA - Statement | 2/22/2008 | |
NOTE: DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST OF MARICOPA COUNTY | |||
2/14/2008 | MEM - Memorandum | 2/20/2008 | |
NOTE: JOINT COMPREHENSIVE PRETRIAL | |||
1/4/2008 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 1/4/2008 | |
1/4/2008 | MOT - Motion | 1/9/2008 | |
NOTE: FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE | |||
12/19/2007 | MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness | 12/26/2007 | |
8/22/2007 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 8/22/2007 | |
8/2/2007 | NSC - Notice of Substitution of Counsel | 8/6/2007 | |
NOTE: WITHIN FIRM | |||
5/21/2007 | ANS - Answer | 5/23/2007 | |
5/21/2007 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 5/22/2007 | |
5/21/2007 | NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials | 5/22/2007 | |
5/8/2007 | ANS - Answer | 5/10/2007 | |
NOTE: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE/ PAID | |||
4/11/2007 | ANS - Answer | 4/13/2007 | |
NOTE: CO-CHG | |||
4/11/2007 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 4/16/2007 | |
4/2/2007 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/4/2007 | |
NOTE: COUNTY OF MARICOPA SERVED 3/20/07 | |||
4/2/2007 | SUM - Summons | 4/4/2007 | |
3/16/2007 | COM - Complaint | 3/20/2007 | |
3/16/2007 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/20/2007 | |
3/16/2007 | NOT - Notice | 3/20/2007 | |
NOTE: OF LIS PENDENS |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
2/25/2008 | 13:30 | Pre-Trial Conference |
9/2/2008 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
2/19/2009 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
6/25/2009 | 8:45 | Status Conference |
6/26/2009 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
6/29/2009 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
8/17/2009 | 14:00 | Oral Argument |
8/18/2009 | 10:00 | Oral Argument |
11/24/2009 | 16:30 | Status Conference |
1/8/2010 | 15:00 | Oral Argument |
5/28/2010 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
7/29/2010 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
9/30/2010 | 8:30 | Status Conference |
8/20/2014 | 13:30 | Status Conference |
12/1/2015 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
3/4/2016 | 10:15 | Status Conference |
5/20/2016 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
6/6/2016 | 8:45 | Trial |
6/13/2016 | 8:45 | Trial |
9/16/2016 | 10:00 | Pre-Trial Conference |
10/7/2016 | 13:30 | Settlement Conference |
10/17/2016 | 8:45 | Trial |
10/24/2016 | 8:45 | Trial |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Date | (F)or / (A)gainst | Amount | Frequency | Type | Status |
12/1/2016 | F:John E Garretson | $5,394.99 | One Time | Costs | Satisfied |
A: City Of Phoenix | |||||
12/1/2016 | F:John E Garretson | $2,869,360.00 | One Time | Principal | Satisfied |
A: City Of Phoenix | |||||
10/26/2016 | F:Maricopa County Creditor | $1,809.28 | One Time | Judgment for Jury Fees | Vacated |
A: City Of Phoenix | |||||
7/16/2010 | F:John E Garretson | $7,134.00 | One Time | Principal | Satisfied |
A: City Of Phoenix |