« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2007-004724
Judge:
Cronin, Mary
File Date:
3/16/2007
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Marc Gladner
Party Name
Jeffrey Brett Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/19/2012
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
7/19/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment Renewal Affidavit / eFile Billing $26
Filing Date
7/19/2012
Description
ARJ - Affidavit: Renewal Of Judgment
Docket Date
7/20/2012
Filing Party
NOTE:
Judgment Renewal Affidavit / eFile Billing $26.00
Filing Date
10/30/2007
Description
PTT - Petition
Docket Date
11/5/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT DEBTOR PROCEEDINGS
Filing Date
8/23/2007
Description
DFJ - Default Judgment
Docket Date
8/29/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
Copy mailed/provided to non-defl. parties on date of filing
Filing Date
8/23/2007
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
8/30/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/22/2007
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
8/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/12/2007
Description
STA - Statement
Docket Date
7/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
REFLECTING COMPUTATION OF PRINCIPAL
Filing Date
7/12/2007
Description
SOC - Statement Of Costs
Docket Date
7/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND NOTICE OF TAXATION OF COSTS
Filing Date
7/12/2007
Description
MAJ - Mot/Aff Entry Def Jud W/O Hear
Docket Date
7/16/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2007
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
6/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/15/2007
Description
AFD - Affidavit On Default
Docket Date
6/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Filing Date
5/29/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/30/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
JEFFREY BRETT HEMPHILL SERVED 5/24/07
Filing Date
3/16/2007
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2007
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
3/20/2007
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
12/19/2007
Time
9:00
Event
Judgment Debtor Exam
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
8/23/2007
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Amica Mutual Insurance Company
A: Jeffrey Brett Hemphill
Amount
$15,623.10
Frequency
One Time
Type
Affidavit of Renewal of Judgment
Status
Modified
Date
8/23/2007
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Amica Mutual Insurance Company
A: Jeffrey Brett Hemphill
Amount
$428.20
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Modified
Date
8/23/2007
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Amica Mutual Insurance Company
A: Jeffrey Brett Hemphill
Amount
$15,494.90
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Modified