Civil Court Case Information - Case History
« Return to search results
Case Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Case Number: | CV2007-003720 | Judge: | Cooper, Katherine |
File Date: | 2/28/2007 | Location: | Southeast |
Case Type: | Civil |
![]() |
Party Information | |||
---|---|---|---|
Party Name | Relationship | Sex | Attorney |
Children Of America Inc | Plaintiff | Russell Stowers | |
Edward Magedson | Defendant | Male | David Gingras |
Xcentric Ventures L L C | Defendant | David Gingras | |
Thad Pryor | Third Party Defendant | Male | Pro Per |
Case Documents | |||
---|---|---|---|
Filing Date | Description | Docket Date | Filing Party |
8/24/2009 | ODI - Order Of Dismissal | 9/11/2009 | |
NOTE: WITH PREJUDICE | |||
4/29/2009 | 005 - ME: Hearing | 4/29/2009 | |
4/24/2009 | SDO - Order to Seal Documents | 5/11/2009 | |
4/3/2009 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 4/3/2009 | |
2/11/2009 | SDD - Notice: Sealed Document | 3/11/2009 | |
NOTE: CHILDREN OF AMERICAS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |||
2/10/2009 | NOF - Notice Of Filing | 2/10/2009 | |
NOTE: Notice of Filing Under Seal | |||
2/2/2009 | ORD - Order | 2/5/2009 | |
NOTE: FOR FILING UNDER SEAL | |||
12/4/2008 | OCC - Order Continuing on Inactive/Dismissal Calendar | 12/4/2008 | |
NOTE: ORDER | |||
12/1/2008 | STP - Stipulation | 12/1/2008 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION FOR FILING UNDER SEAL | |||
11/7/2008 | STP - Stipulation | 11/7/2008 | |
NOTE: STIPULATION | |||
10/30/2008 | MOT - Motion | 10/30/2008 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO ENFORCE RULE 80(d) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |||
10/16/2008 | 078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar | 10/16/2008 | |
10/9/2008 | NOS - Notice Of Settlement | 10/9/2008 | |
NOTE: Notice of Settlement | |||
5/7/2008 | ORD - Order | 5/7/2008 | |
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR FILING ANY STIPULATION OR MOTION TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS THROUGH JUNE 9, 2008 | |||
5/6/2008 | STP - Stipulation | 5/6/2008 | |
NOTE: Stipulation | |||
4/29/2008 | ORD - Order | 4/29/2008 | |
NOTE: ORDER | |||
4/28/2008 | STP - Stipulation | 4/28/2008 | |
NOTE: Stipulation | |||
3/10/2008 | 002 - ME: Hearing Vacated | 3/10/2008 | |
3/5/2008 | STP - Stipulation | 3/5/2008 | |
NOTE: Stipulation Re: Scheduling Modifications | |||
1/18/2008 | NSD - Notice of Service Re: 26.1 Disclosure | 1/18/2008 | |
NOTE: Notice of Service | |||
1/16/2008 | ORD - Order | 1/16/2008 | |
NOTE: ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES | |||
1/11/2008 | STP - Stipulation | 1/11/2008 | |
NOTE: Stipulation Re Expert Disclosure Deadlines | |||
1/7/2008 | CLM - Claim | 1/7/2008 | |
NOTE: Consolidated Counterclaim Reply and Answer to Third-Party Complaint | |||
12/19/2007 | ANS - Answer | 12/20/2007 | |
NOTE: First Amended Verified Answer, Verified Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint | |||
12/11/2007 | 070 - ME: Settlement Conference Set | 12/11/2007 | |
11/30/2007 | 028 - ME: Status Conference Set | 11/30/2007 | |
11/21/2007 | ORD - Order | 11/21/2007 | |
NOTE: ORDER | |||
11/20/2007 | REP - Report | 11/20/2007 | |
NOTE: Joint Scheduling Report | |||
11/15/2007 | STP - Stipulation | 11/15/2007 | |
NOTE: Stipulation Re: Cost Bond | |||
11/13/2007 | ANS - Answer | 11/16/2007 | |
NOTE: VERIFIED/ VERIFIED COUNTERCLAIM AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT | |||
11/7/2007 | 026 - ME: Pretrial Conference Set | 11/7/2007 | |
11/1/2007 | MSE - Motion To Set & Cert/Readiness | 11/1/2007 | |
NOTE: Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness | |||
11/1/2007 | REQ - Request | 11/1/2007 | |
NOTE: Request for Telephonic Rule 16 Conference | |||
11/1/2007 | OBJ - Objection/Opposition. | 11/1/2007 | |
NOTE: Defendants Objection to Plaintiffs Motion to Set and Certificate of Readiness and Controverting Certificate | |||
10/31/2007 | 019 - ME: Ruling | 10/31/2007 | |
10/31/2007 | MOT - Motion | 11/1/2007 | |
NOTE: Motion for Security for Costs Per Rule 67(d) | |||
10/12/2007 | NOT - Notice | 10/15/2007 | |
NOTE: Defendants Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority re Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint | |||
8/30/2007 | 020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement | 8/30/2007 | |
8/7/2007 | REL - Reply | 8/8/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 100899 -- Defendants Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint | |||
8/1/2007 | 311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry | 8/1/2007 | |
7/23/2007 | RES - Response | 7/23/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 96806 -- Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint | |||
7/19/2007 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 7/19/2007 | |
7/10/2007 | ORD - Order | 7/10/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 92768 -- ORDER VACATING JULY 11, 2007 HEARING ON MOTIONS | |||
7/9/2007 | MTD - Motion To Dismiss | 7/9/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 92628 -- Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint | |||
7/5/2007 | WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons | 7/5/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 91672 -- Waiver of Service | |||
7/5/2007 | AMC - Amended Complaint | 7/5/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 91704 -- Verified Amended Complaint | |||
7/5/2007 | STP - Stipulation | 7/5/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 91709 -- Stipulation to Vacate July 11, 2007 Hearing on Pending Motions | |||
6/26/2007 | 094 - ME: Oral Argument Set | 6/26/2007 | |
6/25/2007 | RES - Response | 6/25/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 88673 -- Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Determine Validity of Service on Ed Magedson | |||
6/15/2007 | REL - Reply | 6/15/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 86518 -- Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Xcentrics Motion to Dismiss | |||
6/6/2007 | 530 - ME: Case Designated for Mandatory E-Filing | 6/6/2007 | |
6/5/2007 | RES - Response | 6/5/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 82895 -- Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint | |||
6/5/2007 | MOT - Motion | 6/5/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 82919 -- Motion to Determine Validity of Service on Defendant Magedson | |||
6/5/2007 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 6/5/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 82907 -- Notice of Hearing | |||
6/5/2007 | NOH - Notice Of Hearing | 6/5/2007 | |
NOTE: eFile Id 82915 -- Notice of Hearing | |||
5/23/2007 | 066 - ME: Case Reassigned | 5/23/2007 | |
5/18/2007 | 088 - ME: Case Transferred | 5/18/2007 | |
5/16/2007 | NJR - Notice of change of Judge for right | 5/17/2007 | |
5/16/2007 | ANS - Answer | 5/17/2007 | |
NOTE: MOTION TO DISMISS/ PAID | |||
4/27/2007 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/30/2007 | |
NOTE: SERVED XCENTRIC VENTURES LLC ON 04/27/07 | |||
4/27/2007 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/30/2007 | |
NOTE: SERVED EDWARD MAGEDSON ON 04/27/07 | |||
4/16/2007 | AFS - Affidavit Of Service | 4/17/2007 | |
4/13/2007 | AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service | 4/13/2007 | |
2/28/2007 | COM - Complaint | 3/5/2007 | |
2/28/2007 | CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject | 3/5/2007 |
Case Calendar | ||
---|---|---|
Date | Time | Event |
7/11/2007 | 9:45 | Oral Argument |
8/27/2007 | 8:45 | Oral Argument |
11/26/2007 | 8:45 | Pre-Trial Conference |
4/2/2008 | 9:00 | Civil Settlement Conference |
4/15/2008 | 9:00 | Status Conference |
4/27/2009 | 8:45 | Oral Argument |
Judgments | |||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
There are no judgments on file |