« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-070483
Judge:
Kaiser, Brian
File Date:
8/2/2006
Location:
Northwest
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Everett R Hemphill
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Norbert Rogers
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Richard Bellah
Party Name
Valerie Rogers
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Richard Bellah
Party Name
Norbert G Rogers
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Richard Bellah
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/22/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
4/4/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
3/15/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/30/2007
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
1/30/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/16/2007
Description
MSJ - Motion For Summary Judgment
Docket Date
1/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS'
Filing Date
1/16/2007
Description
SOF - Statement Of Facts
Docket Date
1/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DEFENDANTS' IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Filing Date
1/3/2007
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
1/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/6/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/13/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
NORBERT ROGERS SR AND VALERIE ROGERS SERVED 11/30/06
Filing Date
12/6/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
12/15/2006
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
12/4/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/6/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES/ PAID
Filing Date
12/4/2006
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
12/12/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/30/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/4/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
NORBERT G ROGERS JR SERVED 11/21/06
Filing Date
11/8/2006
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
11/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/2/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/4/2006
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Filing Date
8/2/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/4/2006
Filing Party
Plaintiff(1)
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/25/2007
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Date
3/14/2007
Time
10:00
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.