Civil Court Case Information - Case History


« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number: CV2006-053264 Judge: Duncan, Sally
File Date: 10/31/2006 Location: Downtown
Case Type: Civil  
Party Information
Party Name Relationship Sex Attorney
Lindsay Borgendale   Plaintiff  Female  Daniel Fredenberg 
Sabin Burrell   Defendant  Unknown  Tina Ezzell 
Case Documents
Filing Date Description Docket Date Filing Party
10/17/2007  047 - ME: Judgment Of Dismissal  10/17/2007   
4/4/2007  311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry  4/4/2007   
1/18/2007  ANS - Answer  1/22/2007   
NOTE: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/ PAID 
11/21/2006  AFS - Affidavit Of Service  11/29/2006   
NOTE: SABIN BURRELL SERVED 11/15/2006 
11/21/2006  SUM - Summons  11/30/2006   
NOTE: AMENDED 
10/31/2006  COM - Complaint  11/1/2006   
10/31/2006  NJT - Not Demand For Jury Trials  11/1/2006   
10/31/2006  CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject  11/1/2006   
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
There are no judgments on file