« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-017826
Judge:
Herrod, Michael
File Date:
11/21/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Enclave Villas Condominiums
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Amy Sells
Party Name
Jason Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
D L J Mortgage Capital Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2007
Description
NDI - Notice Of Dismissal
Docket Date
3/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
VOLUNTARY WITH PREJUDICE
Filing Date
1/31/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/1/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED/ JASON HEMPHILL SERVED 01/04/07
Filing Date
1/8/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/10/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
JASON HEMPHILL SERVED 01/04/2007
Filing Date
1/8/2007
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
1/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/18/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DJL MORTGAGE CAPITAL INC SERVED 12/05/06
Filing Date
11/21/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/27/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/21/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
11/27/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.