« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-016519
Judge:
Hannah, John
File Date:
10/30/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil

Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Laurel Handley
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Cheri Smith
Relationship
Claimant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Michael Fuller
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/18/2008
Description
002 - ME: Hearing Vacated
Docket Date
11/18/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/14/2008
Description
JOR - Judgment And Order
Docket Date
11/19/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
10/7/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
10/14/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
THAT SUCH APPLICATION WILL BE HEARD AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET BY THE COURT IN THIS MATTER ON 11/17/08
Filing Date
9/2/2008
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
9/3/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Cheri Smiths Application to Establish Identity/Motion to Appear by Phone
Filing Date
8/26/2008
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
8/27/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Sterling Asset Recoverys Response to Cheri Smiths Application for Distribution of Excess Proceeds from Trustee Sale
Filing Date
8/7/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/13/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO CONTINUE
Filing Date
8/4/2008
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
8/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Affidavit of Mailing
Filing Date
8/4/2008
Description
SFC - Stipulation For Continuance
Docket Date
8/4/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Stipulation to Continue
Filing Date
7/30/2008
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
8/1/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
PERMITTING SHERRI WEAVER AND CHERI SMITH TO TESTIFY BY PHONIE AT THE EVIDENTIARY HEARING PRESENTLY SET BY THE COURT ON AUGUST 18 2008 AT 2:00 PM
Filing Date
7/24/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/29/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
BY ATTORNEY FOR STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT AUGUST 18 2008 HEARING
Filing Date
7/23/2008
Description
CAN - Credit Memo Appearance Fee Paid
Docket Date
7/31/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/22/2008
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Application for Distribution of Excess Proceeds from Trustee Sale / PAID $176.00 Receipt #10115607
Filing Date
7/22/2008
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
7/24/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
Motion to Appear by Telephone
Filing Date
7/11/2008
Description
003 - ME: Hearing Reset
Docket Date
7/11/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/25/2008
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
6/25/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/7/2008
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/16/2008
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS, APPLICANTS COUNTERCLAIM AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FORFEITURE OF FEES AND COSTS & INTEREST ON EXCESS PROCEEDS NOT DEPOSITED UNTIL 12-4-2006/ PAID
Filing Date
4/2/2008
Description
078 - ME: Case On Dismissal Calendar
Docket Date
4/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2007
Description
530 - ME: Case Designated for Mandatory E-Filing
Docket Date
3/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/13/2007
Description
WSS - Waiver Of Service Of Summons
Docket Date
2/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 12/04/06
Filing Date
12/5/2006
Description
DCL - Declaration
Docket Date
12/8/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FOR DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS
Filing Date
10/30/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
11/1/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
11/1/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
8/18/2008
Time
14:00
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Date
11/17/2008
Time
9:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
11/14/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Cheri Smith
A: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
A: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Amount
$531.47
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Date
11/14/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Cheri Smith
A: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
A: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Amount
$757.04
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status
Date
11/14/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
A: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
A: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Amount
$531.48
Frequency
One Time
Type
Interest
Status
Date
11/14/2008
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
A: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
A: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Amount
$757.04
Frequency
One Time
Type
Costs
Status