« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-014316
Judge:
Fox, Dewain
File Date:
9/22/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Michael A Bosco
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
MARK BOSCO
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Armando Ochoa
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Ingrid-Joy Warrick
Party Name
Juanita Salinas
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
G M A C Mortgage L L C
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Laurel Handley
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/16/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
7/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/29/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/27/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
6/29/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2007
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
6/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/18/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/25/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
Filing Date
6/15/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
6/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/14/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
6/19/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/8/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS FILED ON BEHALF OF STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC
Filing Date
6/5/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
6/7/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
CLAIMANT'S FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE
Filing Date
5/30/2007
Description
094 - ME: Oral Argument Set
Docket Date
5/30/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2007
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
4/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR IMMEDIATE ENTRY OF ORDER
Filing Date
4/11/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
4/11/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
UNPAID / TO APPLICATION FOR EXCESS PROCEED AND CROSS-CLAIM FILED BY GMAC MORTGAGE LLC
Filing Date
4/9/2007
Description
AAD - Application And Affidavit Of Default
Docket Date
4/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/16/2007
Description
OBJ - Objection/Opposition.
Docket Date
3/20/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
GMAC MORTGAGE LLC'S TO APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS FILED BY STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC
Filing Date
3/5/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
3/8/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF EXCESS PROCEEDS AND CROSS CLAIM/ PAID
Filing Date
2/27/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
2/28/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
SUPPLEMENTAL
Filing Date
2/8/2007
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
2/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
2/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/8/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
2/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
2/12/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/6/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
2/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/5/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
2/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
1/30/2007
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
1/31/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITH NO OBJECTION
Filing Date
1/30/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/31/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING OF PROPOSED ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
1/25/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
1/25/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/17/2006
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AMENDED / FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
10/6/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/10/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
10/4/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
10/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/4/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
10/6/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 09/22/06
Filing Date
9/22/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/26/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/26/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
6/14/2007
Time
8:30
Event
Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.