« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-013513
Judge:
McCoy, M. Scott
File Date:
9/6/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
California Reconveyance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Philip Wooten
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Arizona State Department Of Economic Security Division Of Child Support Enforcement
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Tajudeen Oladiran
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/11/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/6/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
4/10/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/29/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/21/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
3/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
3/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/15/2007
Description
STP - Stipulation
Docket Date
3/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
3/15/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
3/19/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 12/02/06
Filing Date
3/9/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/15/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/6/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
3/13/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY THORUGH COUNSEL AT THE HEARING PRESENTLY SET FOR MONDAY MARCH 19 2007 AT 9:30 AM IN THIS DIVISION
Filing Date
3/5/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/5/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/8/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/7/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2007
Description
RTM - Returned Mail or Returned/ReMailed Mail
Docket Date
3/7/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/28/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
3/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
2/21/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
2/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/22/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/24/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
11/20/2006
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
11/28/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF TODD SHERIDAN TO COMPLY WITH ARS 33-812(G)
Filing Date
10/13/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/16/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/PAID
Filing Date
9/6/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/11/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
3/19/2007
Time
9:30
Event
Evidentiary Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.