« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-013512
Judge:
Warner, Randall
File Date:
9/6/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
eFile
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
California Reconveyance Company
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Philip Wooten
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Woodlake Condominium Association Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Chandler Travis
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Ocwen Loan Servicing L L C
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Jason Sherman
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2007
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
4/30/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/26/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
5/1/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/25/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
5/1/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS FILED ON BEHALF OF STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC
Filing Date
4/24/2007
Description
066 - ME: Case Reassigned
Docket Date
4/24/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/23/2007
Description
530 - ME: Case Designated for Mandatory E-Filing
Docket Date
4/23/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
4/2/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE/ TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Filing Date
3/16/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
3/16/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/13/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR EXCESS PROCEEDS FROM TRUSTEE'S SALE PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812(B)
Filing Date
11/22/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
11/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/2/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
11/2/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/31/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
11/7/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
11/1/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
PAID;APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS TO OCWEN LOAN SERVICING LLC
Filing Date
10/27/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER RELEASING PROCEEDS
Filing Date
10/27/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NO OBJECTION
Filing Date
10/24/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
10/27/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 09/20/06
Filing Date
10/5/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/5/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/PAID
Filing Date
9/22/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
9/25/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF PROCEEDS PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812E
Filing Date
9/12/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
9/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF ADDITIONAL CLAIMANT
Filing Date
9/6/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
9/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/6/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
9/11/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
4/30/2007
Time
10:45
Event
Oral Argument
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.