« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-013032
Judge:
Ryan, Timothy
File Date:
8/25/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Beaudry R V Mesa Inc
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
WILLIAM SHATTUCK
Party Name
Western Recreational Vehicles Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/22/2006
Description
NUS - Notice Of Removal Us District Court
Docket Date
9/27/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/21/2006
Description
ADE - Application For Default
Docket Date
10/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
AGAINST DEFENDANT WESTERN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES INC
Filing Date
9/21/2006
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
10/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST WESTERN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES INC
Filing Date
8/29/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WESTERN RECREATIONAL VEHICLES INC SERVED 08/25/2006
Filing Date
8/29/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
8/31/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/25/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/28/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.