« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-012818
Judge:
Ryan, Timothy
File Date:
8/23/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Quality Loan Service Corp
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
PAUL LEVINE
Party Name
David Schweikert
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Standard Pacific Of Arizona Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Jerry Morgan
Party Name
Dove Cove Estates Homeowners Association
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
Chandler Travis
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
3/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
3/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/26/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
3/1/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
2/13/2007
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
2/13/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/9/2007
Description
ODI - Order Of Dismissal
Docket Date
2/18/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/2/2007
Description
SFD - Stipulation For Dismissal
Docket Date
2/6/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION
Filing Date
1/23/2007
Description
005 - ME: Hearing
Docket Date
1/23/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/18/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF NO OBJECTION
Filing Date
1/18/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
1/23/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER RELEASING PROCEEDS
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
12/22/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/13/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
12/14/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 10/10/06
Filing Date
12/13/2006
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICANT STERLING ASSET RECOVERY'S TO APPLICATION FILED BY STANDARD PACIFIC OF ARIZONA INC
Filing Date
12/13/2006
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
12/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICANT STERLING ASSET RECOVERY'S TO APPLICATION FILED BY DOVE COVE ESTATES HOA
Filing Date
12/11/2006
Description
028 - ME: Status Conference Set
Docket Date
12/11/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/7/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/13/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
STANDARD PACIFIC OF ARIZONA INC'S SUBMISSION OF PREPAID ENVELOPES PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812(H)
Filing Date
11/29/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
12/4/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF PROCEEDS PURSUANT TO A R S 33-812G
Filing Date
10/25/2006
Description
AFF - Affidavit
Docket Date
10/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF COUNSEL FOR STANDARD PACIFIC OF ARIZONA INC REGARDING MAILING AND RECEIPT OF APPLICATION
Filing Date
10/23/2006
Description
RES - Response
Docket Date
10/30/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
IN OPPOSITION TO STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INCS APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
10/12/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/16/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR DISTRIBUTION OF SALE PROCEEDS/PAID
Filing Date
10/4/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/11/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
8/30/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
8/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
DAVID SCHWEIKERT SERVED 08/29/2006
Filing Date
8/30/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
9/2/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
8/28/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/23/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/28/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
1/17/2007
Time
8:45
Event
Status Conference
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.