« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-009701
Judge:
Thorson, Erik
File Date:
6/29/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Lee Crosby
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
G Crosby
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/20/2007
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
3/20/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/19/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
3/22/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/1/2007
Description
023 - ME: Order Entered By Court
Docket Date
3/1/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/29/2007
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
2/2/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
ALLOWING COUNSEL FOR STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE HEARING SET FOR FEBRUARY 27 2007 AT 8:45 AM COUNSEL TO INITIATE THE PHONE CALL
Filing Date
1/19/2007
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
1/24/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
EX PARTE FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING
Filing Date
1/11/2007
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
1/11/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/14/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
12/14/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 10/30/06
Filing Date
12/14/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
12/6/2006
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
12/6/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/24/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
10/26/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
8/16/2006
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
8/16/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
8/15/2006
Description
UJU - Unsigned Order/Stipulation/Judgment
Docket Date
8/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/11/2006
Description
MTD - Motion To Dismiss
Docket Date
7/14/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TRUSTEE
Filing Date
7/11/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
7/17/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF MAILING
Filing Date
7/5/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
7/7/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 6/29/06
Filing Date
7/5/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
7/10/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
7/7/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/29/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
7/7/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
2/27/2007
Time
8:45
Event
Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.