« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-009612
Judge:
Civil Court Adm 01, Calendar
File Date:
6/23/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Daimler Chrysler Financial Services Americas L L C
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Joseph Whipple
Party Name
Lisa Cowden
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Female
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Michael Hemphill
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
12/20/2006
Description
323 - ME: Jdgmnt Dismissal - Lack Srv
Docket Date
12/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/29/2006
Description
311 - ME: 150 Day Minute Entry
Docket Date
11/29/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/27/2006
Description
322 - ME: Notice Of Intent To Dismiss
Docket Date
9/27/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
9/14/2006
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
9/15/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/24/2006
Description
AAS - Affidavit Of Attempted Service
Docket Date
7/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/28/2006
Description
LET - Letter
Docket Date
6/29/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
6/29/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/23/2006
Description
CCS - Cerificate Arbitration - Subject To
Docket Date
6/29/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.