« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-007192
Judge:
Blaney, Scott
File Date:
5/12/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Capital Title Agency
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Janessa Koenig
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/3/2007
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
7/6/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
6/19/2007
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
6/21/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
6/19/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
6/21/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/30/2007
Description
APL - Application
Docket Date
5/3/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
4/2/2007
Description
019 - ME: Ruling
Docket Date
4/3/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/2/2007
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
4/5/2007
Filing Party
Filing Date
1/19/2007
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
1/22/2007
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
6/14/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
6/16/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TTRUSTEE'S OF COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF EXCESS SALE PROCEEDS PURSUANT TO ARS 33-812
Filing Date
5/17/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TREASURER OF MARICOPA COUNTY SERVED 05/16/2006
Filing Date
5/17/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/22/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/17/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/12/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/17/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.