« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-006613
Judge:
Thorson, Erik
File Date:
5/4/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Jason P Sherman
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Christopher Perry
Party Name
Maricopa County Treasurer
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Sterling Asset Recovery Inc
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Attorney
J Montijo
Party Name
Bradley D Fisher
Relationship
In The Matter Of (IMO)
Sex
Male
Attorney
Earl Berg
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2006
Description
022 - ME: Order Signed
Docket Date
11/8/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/8/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/20/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/7/2006
Description
ORD - Order
Docket Date
11/14/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
WITHDRAWING EARL E BERG AS COUNSEL FOR BRADLEY D FISHER AND WITHDRAWING APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
11/6/2006
Description
OFR - Order Approving Release of Funds
Docket Date
11/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
11/3/2006
Description
020 - ME: Matter Under Advisement
Docket Date
11/3/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
10/30/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/1/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR BRADLEY D FISHER AND WITHDRAW ITS APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
10/27/2006
Description
NOT - Notice
Docket Date
11/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
OF LODGING ORDER FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS
Filing Date
10/27/2006
Description
AFM - Affidavit of Service Registered/Certified Mail
Docket Date
10/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 08/05/06
Filing Date
10/26/2006
Description
MOT - Motion
Docket Date
11/2/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
FOR TELEPHONICE HEARING
Filing Date
9/25/2006
Description
056 - ME: Hearing Set
Docket Date
9/25/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/28/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/31/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
7/28/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
8/2/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
7/27/2006
Description
ANS - Answer
Docket Date
7/28/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
APPLICATION FOR RELEASE OF EXCESS PROCEEDS/ PAID
Filing Date
5/22/2006
Description
AFS - Affidavit Of Service
Docket Date
5/23/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
MARICOPA COUNTY TREASURER SERVED 5-4-2006
Filing Date
5/22/2006
Description
SUM - Summons
Docket Date
5/23/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
5/9/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
5/4/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
5/9/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
Date
Time
Event
Date
10/30/2006
Time
13:30
Event
Hearing
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
No records found.