« Return to search results
Case Information
Case Number:
CV2006-004527
Judge:
Whitten, Christopher
File Date:
3/28/2006
Location:
Downtown
Case Type:
Civil
Party Information
Party Name
Relationship
Sex
Attorney
Party Name
Arizona State
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Attorney
Cherie Howe
Party Name
Terry Goddard
Relationship
Plaintiff
Sex
Male
Attorney
Cherie Howe
Party Name
Smart Advertising Solutions L L C
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Bill Fautsch
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Thomas Kelly
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Male
Attorney
Pro Per
Party Name
Smart Advertising Solutions Inc
Relationship
Defendant
Sex
Attorney
Pro Per
Case Documents
Filing Date
Description
Docket Date
Filing Party
Filing Date
2/11/2008
Description
SJU - Satisfaction Of Judgment
Docket Date
2/15/2008
Filing Party
Filing Date
4/13/2006
Description
JUD - Judgment
Docket Date
4/18/2006
Filing Party
NOTE:
Notice of filing and entry provided to the parties
Filing Date
3/28/2006
Description
COM - Complaint
Docket Date
3/31/2006
Filing Party
Filing Date
3/28/2006
Description
CCN - Cert Arbitration - Not Subject
Docket Date
3/31/2006
Filing Party
Case Calendar
There are no calendar events on file
Judgments
Date
(F)or / (A)gainst
Amount
Frequency
Type
Status
Date
4/13/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Arizona State, Terry Goddard
A: Smart Advertising Solutions L L C
Amount
$25,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Attorney Fee
Status
Satisfied
Date
4/13/2006
(F)or / (A)gainst
F:  Arizona State, Terry Goddard
A: Smart Advertising Solutions L L C
Amount
$225,000.00
Frequency
One Time
Type
Principal
Status
Satisfied